EP3673968 - SLUDGE TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suido Kiko Kaisha, Ltd. 5-48-16 Sakuragaoka Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0054 / JP | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAMURA, Akihiro c/o SUIDO KIKO KAISHA LTD. 5-48-16 Sakuragaoka Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0054 / JP | 02 /
NAITOU, Daisuke c/o SUIDO KIKO KAISHA LTD. 5-48-16 Sakuragaoka Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0054 / JP | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 17922196.5 | 23.08.2017 | [2020/27] | WO2017JP30064 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019038842 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3673968 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3673968 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D21/18, B01D21/20, F16H55/00, B65G23/00 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
B01D21/20 (EP,US);
B01D21/18 (EP,US);
B01D21/245 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/27] | B01D21/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAMMBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/27] | English: | SLUDGE TREATMENT DEVICE | [2020/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE BOUES | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2020 | Translation filed | 14.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 06.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 31.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 31.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IE | 23.08.2023 | LU | 23.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IE | 23.08.2023 | ||
LU | 23.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
LU | 23.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
LU | 23.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2211922 (RUHRKOHLE AG) [A] 1-5* figures 1-3 *; | [I]US5478471 (FUJIWARA MICHIHIRO [JP]) [I] 1-5 * figures 8-10 *; | [A]DE102004055981 (FUJIWARA SANGYO K K [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-10; claims 1-17 * | International search | [A]JPS51117447 (HITACHI PLANT ENG & CONSTR CO) [A] 1-5 * , claims; page 2, upper right column, line 6 to lower right column, line 16; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0629605U (Mitsuhiro FUJIWARA) [A] 1-5 * , claims; paragraphs [0005] to [0015]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005021874 (FUJIWARA SANGYO KK) [A] 1-5 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0001], [0029] to [0031]; fig. 1 to 6 & CN 1575842 A & TW 200507917 A *; | [A]CN101530682 (HANGZHOU SUNLAND ENVIRONMENTAL) [A] 1-5* , fig. 1 to 13; page 4, lines 3 to 4; examples (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2603973B |