EP3672128 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/31] |
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Hai No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang' an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Penza, Giancarlo Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 17924220.1 | 07.09.2017 | [2020/26] | WO2017CN100948 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019047123 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672128 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3672128 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/08, H04W76/15 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04W28/0252 (KR);
H04W72/1221 (CN);
H04W28/06 (US);
H04L1/1614 (KR,US);
H04L5/003 (CN);
H04L5/0098 (KR);
H04W28/04 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (CN);
H04W72/1263 (CN);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W80/02 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | H04L1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2020/26] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2020/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2020 | Translation filed | 18.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 18.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2017 | AL | 04.08.2021 | AT | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | CZ | 04.08.2021 | DK | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | ES | 04.08.2021 | FI | 04.08.2021 | HR | 04.08.2021 | IT | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MC | 04.08.2021 | MK | 04.08.2021 | NL | 04.08.2021 | PL | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SE | 04.08.2021 | SI | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | TR | 04.08.2021 | IE | 07.09.2021 | LU | 07.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | CH | 30.09.2021 | LI | 30.09.2021 | FR | 04.10.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | NO | 04.11.2021 | GR | 05.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | PT | 06.12.2021 | DE | 01.04.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 07.09.2017 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 07.09.2021 | ||
LU | 07.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 04.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 07.09.2017 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 07.09.2021 | ||
LU | 07.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 04.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 07.09.2021 | ||
LU | 07.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 04.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/41] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 07.09.2021 | ||
LU | 07.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
FR | 04.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 07.09.2021 | ||
LU | 07.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 07.09.2021 | ||
LU | 07.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 07.09.2021 | ||
LU | 07.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 07.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
DE | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/27] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - VIVO, "Layer-2 behaviors of PDCP duplication activation deactivation", vol. RAN WG2, no. Berlin, Germany; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1708508_LAYER-2 BEHAVIORS OF PDCP DUPLICATION ACTIVATION DEACTIVATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANT, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170820), XP051318363 [X] 1,5,7,9,13-15 * paragraph [Section 1 "Introduction"] * * paragraph [Section 2.2] * * paragraph [Section 2.3] * [A] 2-4,6,8,10-12 | [XA] - LENOVO ET AL, "PDCP packet duplication", vol. RAN WG2, no. Berlin, Germany; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1708624, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170820), XP051318450 [X] 1,6-9,14 * paragraph [Section 2 "Discussion"] * [A] 2-5,10-13,15 | [XA] - VICE-CHAIRWOMAN (INTERDIGITAL), "Report from LTE and NR User Plane Break-Out Session", vol. RAN WG2, no. Berlin, Germany; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170827), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1709663_NR_UP_LTE_BREAKOUT SESSION_25-08-17, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_99/Docs/, (20170827), XP051330342 [X] 1,7,9,14 * paragraph [10.3.1.11 " Impact of PDCP duplication on MAC] * [A] 2-6,8,10-13,15 |