EP3675548 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING BEAMFORMING IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Sanghyun 106-1503 95 Seogang-ro Mapo-gu Seoul 04064 / KR | 02 /
YOON, Sungrok 104-802 23 Noryangjin-ro 23ga-gil Dongjak-gu Seoul 06902 / KR | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 17924909.9 | 15.12.2017 | [2020/27] | WO2017KR14792 | Priority number, date | KR20170119790 | 18.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170119790 | [2020/27] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019054575 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3675548 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3675548 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, // H04W16/28 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W16/28 (EP,KR,US);
H04W16/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04W24/10 (KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/27] | H04W16/28, H04W16/18, H04W24/02, H04W24/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB VON STRAHLFORMUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2020/27] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING BEAMFORMING IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2020/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE FORMATION DE FAISCEAU DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2020 | Translation filed | 23.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 06.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | LU | 15.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SI | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004072545 (HAMALAINEN JYRI [FI], et al) [X] 1,13-15* paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] *; | [XAI]US2012276901 (KRUGLICK EZEKIEL [US]) [X] 1,13-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 1a-1c * [A] 12 [I] 2-5,9-11; | [XAI]US2017201892 (WEN RONG [CN], et al) [X] 1,13-15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0073] * * figures 3,8 * [A] 12 [I] 2,6-11 | International search | [Y]US2005261028 (CHITRAPU PRABHAKAR R [US]) [Y] 1, 10, 13-15 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0017]; and claims 1-26. *; | [A]WO2012152306 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * See page 20, line 10-page 23, line 20; and claims 1-15. *; | [YA]KR20140002403 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1, 10, 13-15 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0017], [0034]-[0036] and claims 1-22 * [A] 2-9, 11, 12; | [A]KR20140090495 (KT CORP [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0043]-[0046], [0074]-[0077]; and claims 1-7. *; | [A]WO2017133772 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [A] 1-15 * See page 8, line 25-page 13, line 23; and claims 1-13. * |