EP3684119 - USER TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Yuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
TAKEDA, Kazuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 17925430.5 | 15.09.2017 | [2020/30] | WO2017JP33598 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019053903 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3684119 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L1/18, H04L5/00 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04L1/1887 (US);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L27/2607 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | BENUTZERENDGERÄT UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2020/30] | English: | USER TERMINAL AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2020/30] | French: | TERMINAL UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2020 | Translation filed | 01.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 23.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Long-PUCCH for up to 2 bits", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, (20170912), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1716100, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1709/Docs/, (20170912), XP051329759 [X] 1,3-5 * pages 7-8 * [I] 2 | [XI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Short PUCCH for UCI of up to 2 bits", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, (20170909), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1715399, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1709/Docs/, (20170909), XP051328962 [X] 1,3-5 * pages 4-6 * [I] 2 | [XI] - ZTE ET AL, "On short PUCCH for up to 2 bits UCI", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, (20170912), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1715522 ON SHORT PUCCH FOR UP TO 2 BITS UCI, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1709/Docs/, (20170912), XP051329400 [X] 1,3-5 * pages 3, 5 * [I] 2 | [XI] - CATT, "Further details of short PUCCH for up to two UCI bits", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czechia; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1712400, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051315216 [X] 1,3-5 * pages 2-3 * [I] 2 | International search | [XY] - "Short-PUCCH for up to 2 UCI bits", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting NR#3, R1-1715680, (20170912), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/TSG_RAN/WG1_RL1/TSGR1 _AH/NR_AH_1709/Docs/R1-1715680.zip, (20171116), XP051329438 [X] 1, 3, 6 [Y] 2, 4, 5 | [Y] - "Short-PUCCH for UCI of up to 2 bits", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting NR Ad-Hoc#3, Rl-1716098, 3GPP, (20170912), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/TSG_RAN/WG1_RL 1/TSGR 1_AH/NR_AH_1709/Docs/R1-1716098.zip, (20171116), XP051329757 [Y] 2, 4, 5 |