EP3551130 - MEASUREMENT AND SIMULATION DEVICE USED FOR AORTIC VALVE- SPARING ROOT REPLACEMENT OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elibol, Ahmet Sultanciftligi Mahallesi Kibris Caddesi Neveser Tasdelen Konaklari B5 D2, Tasdelen Istanbul / TR | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Kaya, Erdem Erdem Kaya Patent Inc. Konak Mahallesi Kudret Sk. Elitpark Park Sit. Ofisler Apt. No: 12/27 16110 Nilüfer/Bursa / TR | [2023/47] |
Former [2019/42] | Kaya, Erdem Erdem Kaya Patent Inc. Konak Mah. Kudret Sok. Senyurt Is Merkezi No. 6 Daire: 8 16110 Nilüfer/Bursa / TR | Application number, filing date | 17925444.6 | 29.11.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017TR50610 | Priority number, date | TR20160018240 | 09.12.2016 Original published format: TR 201618240 | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019054961 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3551130 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3551130 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24, A61F2/07, A61B17/04, A61B17/11 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
A61B90/06 (EP);
A61F2/2496 (EP,US);
A61B17/0482 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00243 (US);
A61B2017/0406 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0414 (US);
A61B2017/0464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1107 (EP);
A61B2090/061 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESS- UND SIMULATIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR HERZKLAPPENERHALTENDE AORTENWURZELAUSTAUSCHOPERATIONEN | [2019/42] | English: | MEASUREMENT AND SIMULATION DEVICE USED FOR AORTIC VALVE- SPARING ROOT REPLACEMENT OPERATIONS | [2019/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE ET DE SIMULATION UTILISÉ POUR DES OPÉRATIONS DE REMPLACEMENT DE RACINE AORTIQUE AVEC CONSERVATION AORTIQUE VALVULAIRE | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 30.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | MC | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SK | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0150985 (VIACOR INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * pages 13-16; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2010249661 (RIGHINI GIOVANNI [IT], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0024] - [0028]; figures 1-2b *; | [A]WO2012106354 (ST JUDE MEDICAL [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0041] - [0045]; figures 1-2b * | International search | [A]WO9730659 (WILLIAMSON WARREN P IV [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * The whole document *; | [A]US6494889 (FLEISCHMAN SIDNEY D [US], et al) [A] 1-14* The whole document *; | [A]US2009299469 (KOLLAR ANDRAS C [US]) [A] 1-14 * The whole document *; | [A]US2014371842 (MARQUEZ SALVADOR [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * Abstract, Paragraphs [0008]-[0013], [0033], [0060]-[0071], [0081]-[0085], [0091], [0119]-[0121], [0124] *; | [A]WO2015077599 (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * Abstract, Paragraphs [0009]-[0010], [0026], [0174], [0264]-[0265], [0289]-[0298] * | by applicant | WO0150985 | EP1994913 | EP1848375 |