EP3690382 - AUTOMATIC MUZZLE CLEANING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soosung Machinery Co., Ltd. Dalcheon-dong 39 Nonggongdanji 3-gil Buk-gu Ulsan 44201 / KR | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AN, Sang-Jin (Gangbyeon Central Heights Sinjeong-dong) 102-2304, 53 Jungang-ro 290beon-gil Nam-gu Ulsan 44680 / KR | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 17926440.3 | 28.11.2017 | [2020/32] | WO2017KR13630 | Priority number, date | KR20170124824 | 27.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170124824 | [2020/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019066138 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3690382 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3690382 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F41A29/02, B08B9/043, B08B9/045 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
B08B9/045 (EP);
F41A29/02 (EP,KR,US);
B08B9/0436 (KR,US);
B08B2209/04 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | F41A29/02, B08B9/043 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE MÜNDUNGSREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/32] | English: | AUTOMATIC MUZZLE CLEANING APPARATUS | [2020/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE DE BOUCHE AUTOMATIQUE | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2020 | Translation filed | 20.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 23.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20090013488 (SOO SUNG MACHINERY COMPANY [KR]) | International search | [A]KR100610183B (ROTEM CO [KR]); | [A]KR100662606B (SOO SUNG MACHINERY COMPANY [KR]); | [A]KR20090013488 (SOO SUNG MACHINERY COMPANY [KR]); | [A]KR101411525B (SOOSUNG MACHINERY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR101706657B (GIM IN YEONG [KR]) | by applicant | KR100662606B | KR100920446B |