EP3691359 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2020/32] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Zhihua No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Wenhong No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Zhi No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 17926731.5 | 13.10.2017 | [2020/32] | WO2017CN106214 | Priority number, date | WO2017CN104591 | 29.09.2017 Original published format: PCT/CN2017/104591 | [2020/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019061580 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3691359 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3691359 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04B7/06 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
H04L5/005 (EP,IL);
H04W72/00 (IL);
H04W72/21 (IL,KR);
H04W72/1268 (CN,IL);
H04W72/53 (IL,US);
H04B17/373 (IL);
H04B7/0408 (IL);
H04B7/0617 (IL,US);
H04B7/0626 (IL,KR,US);
H04B7/0682 (IL);
H04B7/0695 (EP,IL);
H04B7/06968 (KR);
H04L1/0038 (IL,KR,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,IL);
H04L5/0048 (EP,IL,KR);
H04L5/0051 (IL,US);
H04L5/0053 (IL);
H04W16/28 (IL);
H04W72/0446 (IL);
H04W72/0453 (IL);
H04W72/23 (IL,KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/48] | H04W72/00, H04L5/00, H04B7/00, H04W74/08 | ||
Former IPC [2020/32] | H04W72/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION | [2022/01] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2020/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/32] | DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2020 | Translation filed | 29.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 17.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22175953.3 / EP4075713 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.06.2022 | CY | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | DK | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | MK | 08.06.2022 | MT | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SE | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | NO | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | IE | 13.10.2022 | LU | 13.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/27] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
MK | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
IE | 13.10.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
IE | 13.10.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
IE | 13.10.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | CZ | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3462664 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 1-8,13-20 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0323] ** paragraph [0398] - paragraph [0614] *; | [XI] - MEDIATEK INC, "Multi-beam Operation for PDCCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1713676, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051316476 [X] 1-8,13-20 * Sections 1-3. * [I] 9-12,21-24 | [XI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Beam indication for control and data channels", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1712222, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051315039 [X] 1-8,13-20 * Sections 1-4. * [I] 9-12,21-24 |