EP3700268 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE FOR THE SELECTION OF A RULE IN A UE ROUTE SELECTION POLICY (URSP) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/35] | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE | ||
[2021/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Hai No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2021/40] |
Former [2020/35] | Ziebig & Hengelhaupt Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Leipziger Straße 49 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 17928855.0 | 20.10.2017 | [2020/35] | WO2017CN107168 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019075763 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3700268 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3700268 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, H04W4/24, H04M15/00, H04W76/12, // H04W76/15, H04W76/18 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
H04W76/12 (EP,RU,US);
H04W76/10 (CN,KR);
H04W80/10 (KR,US);
H04L12/14 (EP);
H04L12/1407 (EP,RU);
H04M15/66 (EP,RU,US);
H04M15/8228 (EP);
H04W4/24 (EP);
H04W40/02 (US);
H04W40/248 (US);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W72/56 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/42] | H04W28/06, H04W72/04 | ||
Former IPC [2020/35] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWAHL EINER REGEL IN EINER UE ROUTE SELECTION POLICY (URSP) | [2021/27] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE FOR THE SELECTION OF A RULE IN A UE ROUTE SELECTION POLICY (URSP) | [2021/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL DE SELECTION UN RÈGLE D'UNE POLITIQUE DE SÉLECTION D'ITINÉRAIRE D'UE (URSP) | [2021/27] |
Former [2020/35] | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2020/35] | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE | ||
Former [2020/35] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF RÉSEAU | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2020 | Translation filed | 19.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 16.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21196875.5 / EP3965367 | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2017 | AL | 06.10.2021 | AT | 06.10.2021 | CY | 06.10.2021 | CZ | 06.10.2021 | DK | 06.10.2021 | EE | 06.10.2021 | FI | 06.10.2021 | HR | 06.10.2021 | LT | 06.10.2021 | LV | 06.10.2021 | MC | 06.10.2021 | MK | 06.10.2021 | RO | 06.10.2021 | RS | 06.10.2021 | SI | 06.10.2021 | SK | 06.10.2021 | SM | 06.10.2021 | IE | 20.10.2021 | LU | 20.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | BG | 06.01.2022 | IS | 06.02.2022 | PT | 07.02.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 20.10.2017 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
LU | 20.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 06.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; System Architecture for the 5G System; Stage 2 (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD ; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION ; 3GPP TS 23.501, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20170909), vol. SA WG2, no. V1.3.0, pages 1 - 176, XP051336907 [X] 1,9 * paragraph [5.15.5.2] - paragraph [5.15.5.3] * * paragraph [A.3.1.8.1] - paragraph [A.3.1.8.3] * | [XA] - OPPO, "Updating for clause 6.1.2.2 in TS 23503", vol. SA WG2, no. Ljubljana, Slovenia; 20171023 - 20171027, (20171017), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-176999-UPDATING FOR CLAUSE 6.1.2.2 IN TS 23503 P-CR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRA, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_123_Ljubljana/Docs/, (20171017), XP051359695 [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [A] 2-8,10-15 |