EP3698659 - BATTERY UNIT, FLAVOR INHALER, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING BATTERY UNIT, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6927 / JP | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Manabu c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 02 /
AKAO, Takeshi c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 17929280.0 | 18.10.2017 | [2020/35] | WO2017JP37757 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019077711 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3698659 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3698659 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/50, G01R31/36, A24F40/40, A24F40/53, H02J7/00 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
H02J7/0036 (EP,US);
A24F40/40 (RU,US);
A24F40/90 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/50 (EP,US);
A24F40/51 (US);
A24F40/60 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/3644 (US);
G01R31/3835 (US);
G01R31/392 (KR,US);
H01M10/44 (US);
H01M10/48 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H02J7/00 (US);
H02J7/00309 (EP);
H02J7/0031 (EP);
H02J7/0049 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/35] | A24F47/00, G01R31/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEEINHEIT, AROMAINHALATOR, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER BATTERIEEINHEIT UND PROGRAMM | [2020/35] | English: | BATTERY UNIT, FLAVOR INHALER, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING BATTERY UNIT, AND PROGRAM | [2020/35] | French: | UNITÉ DE BATTERIE, INHALATEUR D'ARÔME, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNITÉ DE BATTERIE, ET PROGRAMME | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2020 | Translation filed | 05.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 04.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.05.2022 | 04.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
PT | 07.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1333554 (DIALOG SEMICONDUCTOR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0029] *; | [Y]CN104770884 (SHENZHEN LICHUANG MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD) [Y] 3,5 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0043] *; | [XYI]WO2017015042 (RAI STRATEGIC HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,9-12 * figures 1,3-7 * * page 11, line 13 - page 12, line 4 * [Y] 3,5 [I] 4,7,8 | International search | [Y]JP2004288537 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 4-10 * , paragraph [0022], fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2007024541 (HITACHI KOKI KK) [Y] 7-10* , paragraph [0030] & US 2007/0013344 A1, paragraph [0042] & CN 1896762 A *; | [Y]JP2012183611 (MAKITA CORP) [Y] 3-10 * , paragraph [0013], claim 8 & US 2013/0335013 A1, paragraph [0005], claim 8 & WO 2012/120750 A1 & EP 2684647 A1 & CN 103402709 A *; | [Y]JP2013186956 (SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MFG) [Y] 1, 3-12 * , paragraph [0037], claim 2 (Family: none) *; | [YA]WO2016119626 (XMART CHIP MICROELECTRONIC CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1, 3-12 * , paragraphs [0006]-[0014], fig. 1, 1A, 1B & US 2017/0303597 A * [A] 2 | Examination | - KESKIN NURCAN ET AL, "Double-pulse charge technique for wireless and mobile devices", ANALOG INTEGRATED CIRCUITS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, SPRINGER NEW YORK LLC, US, vol. 86, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S10470-015-0663-3, ISSN 0925-1030, (20151126), pages 299 - 305, (20151126), XP035898872 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10470-015-0663-3 | by applicant | WO2014141834 | JP2015085528 |