EP3706186 - MANUFACTURING METHOD OF OLED SUBSTRATE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF OLED DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wuhan China Star Optoelectronics Semiconductor Display Technology Co., Ltd. 305 Room, Building C5 Biolake of Optics Valley No. 666 Gaoxin Avenue Wuhan East Lake High-tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430079 / CN | [2023/51] |
Former [2020/37] | For all designated states Wuhan China Star Optoelectronics Semiconductor Display Technology Co., Ltd. 305 Room, Building C5 Biolake of Optics Valley No. 666 Gaoxin Avenue Wuhan East Lake High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430070 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Songshan 305 Room Building C5 Biolake of Optics Valley No.666 Gaoxin Avenue Wuhan East Lake High-tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430079 / CN | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2024/16] |
Former [2020/37] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Bettinastraße 53-55 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 17930913.3 | 16.11.2017 | [2020/37] | WO2017CN111262 | Priority number, date | CN20171135471 | 30.10.2017 Original published format: CN201711035471 | [2020/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019085032 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3706186 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3706186 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H10K59/80, H10K59/122, H10K71/00, // H10K59/12 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H10K59/122 (EP);
H10K71/00 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K59/80518 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K71/60 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K59/1201 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/32] | H01L51/56, H01L51/52, H01L27/32 | ||
Former IPC [2020/37] | H01L51/56, H01L51/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR OLED-SUBSTRAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR OLED-ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/37] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD OF OLED SUBSTRATE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF OLED DISPLAY DEVICE | [2020/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SUBSTRAT DE DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES ORGANIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES ORGANIQUES | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2020 | Translation filed | 19.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 31.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2005038642 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraphs [0019] , [0021] , [0024] , [0036] - [0039] - [0040] - [0043]; figure 1 * [A] 2; | [XA]US2009195151 (NAGAYAMA KENSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * paragraphs [0062] , [ 0086] - [0095]; figure 9 * [A] 2; | [XA]US2013038203 (KIM YOUNG-IL [KR]) [X] 1,3,6 * paragraphs [0018] - [0019] - [0040] , [0042] , [0043] , [0049] , [0050] , [0068] - [0073]; figures 1,4-9 * [A] 2; | [A]US2014197395 (ARIYOSHI TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0037] - [0049]; figures 3,4 * |