EP3712879 - GRAYSCALE COMPENSATION DATA MEASURING METHOD OF LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen China Star Optoelectronics Semiconductor Display Technology Co., Ltd. No. 9-2 Tangming Road Gongming Street Guangming New District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518132 / CN | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Hua No. 9-2 Tangming Road Gongming Street Guangming New District Shenzhen Guangdong 518132 / CN | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 17932022.1 | 14.12.2017 | [2020/39] | WO2017CN116280 | Priority number, date | CN201711148907 | 17.11.2017 Original published format: CN201711148907 | [2020/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019095481 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3712879 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G09G3/34, G09G3/00 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
G09G3/006 (EP);
G09G3/3406 (EP,CN,KR);
G09G3/3611 (CN);
G09G3/3413 (CN,KR);
G09G3/36 (EP);
G09G3/3607 (CN,KR);
G09G2320/0233 (EP);
G09G2320/0271 (CN,KR);
G09G2320/0285 (EP);
G09G2320/0693 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | G09G3/36, G09G3/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON GRAUSTUFENKOMPENSATIONSDATEN EINER FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGETAFEL | [2020/39] | English: | GRAYSCALE COMPENSATION DATA MEASURING METHOD OF LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY PANEL | [2020/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE DONNÉES DE COMPENSATION D'ÉCHELLE DE GRIS D'UN PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2020 | Translation filed | 02.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 18.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/47] | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016148582 (CHUNG JAE-SEOB [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-4 *; | [I]US2016078825 (KIM HO-IN [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0078]; figures 2,3,4 *; | [I]CN106328083 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-4 *; | EP3525202 [ ] (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT [CN]) [ ] * the whole document *; | [I]US2006056197 (ROBINSON JAMES [CA], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032]; figures 3,4 * |