EP3678253 - COILED BATTERY CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningde Amperex Technology Limited No.1 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng Zone Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Qiao NO.1 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng Zone Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
XIAO, LiangZhen NO.1 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng Zone Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
WANG, KeFei NO.1 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng Zone Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | Application number, filing date | 17933481.8 | 01.12.2017 | [2020/28] | WO2017CN114271 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019104720 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678253 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0587, H01M10/04 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
H01M10/0431 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0587 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0459 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (CN);
H01M10/0585 (KR,US);
H01M4/13 (CN);
H01M50/463 (KR);
H01M50/466 (KR);
H01M50/531 (CN,KR);
H01M50/538 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/579 (KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/28] | H01M10/0587 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | GEWICKELTE BATTERIEZELLE | [2020/28] | English: | COILED BATTERY CELL | [2020/28] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE BATTERIE ENROULÉ | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2020 | Translation filed | 31.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 30.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP2187466 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]EP2299522 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]CN107171028 (AMPRIUS (WUXI) CO LTD) |