EP3628394 - TRAIN, AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING COMPRESSED GAS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRRC Changchun Railway Vehicles Co., Ltd. No 2001 Changke Road Changchun, Jilin 130000 / CN | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAO, Feng No 2001, Changke Road Changchun Jilin 130000 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Yangkun No 2001, Changke Road Changchun Jilin 130000 / CN | 03 /
XIN, Zhiqiang No 2001, Changke Road Changchun Jilin 130000 / CN | 04 /
MA, Yongjing No 2001, Changke Road Changchun Jilin 130000 / CN | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2020/14] | Application number, filing date | 17935742.1 | 28.12.2017 | [2020/14] | WO2017CN119272 | Priority number, date | CN201711387396 | 20.12.2017 Original published format: CN201711387396 | CN201721800116U | 20.12.2017 Original published format: CN 201721800116 U | [2020/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019119499 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3628394 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26, B01D46/46, B60T17/00, B60T17/22, B60T13/66 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
B60T17/004 (EP);
B01D46/46 (EP);
B01D53/26 (EP);
B60T13/26 (RU);
B60T13/665 (EP);
B60T17/02 (RU);
B60T17/228 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/14] | B01D53/26, B01D46/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] | Title | German: | ZUG SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON DRUCKGAS DAFÜR | [2020/14] | English: | TRAIN, AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING COMPRESSED GAS THEREOF | [2020/14] | French: | TRAIN, ET DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ COMPRIMÉ DE CELUI-CI | [2020/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2019 | Translation filed | 27.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 30.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/35] | 13.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2126124 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1,5,8,9,11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02074422 (GRAHAM WHITE MFG COMPANY [US]) [X] 1,5,6,8,9,11 * the whole document *; | [A]CN202460433U (MINGLING CHU) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2602164 (MAN TRUCK & BUS AG [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document * |