EP3517290 - TOGGLE PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promess Gesellschaft für Montage- und Prüfsysteme mbH Nunsdorfer Ring 29 12277 Berlin / DE | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grützner, Philip Wilhelm-Külz-Str. 94 14532 Stahnsdorf / DE | 02 /
Berding, Jens Gürtelstr. 15 10247 Berlin / DE | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | ETL IP Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Clayallee 343 14169 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | Kietzmann, Manfred Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrichstrasse 95 IHZ P.O. Box 4 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 18000074.7 | 29.01.2018 | [2019/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3517290 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B30B15/00, B30B1/10, B30B15/04 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
B30B15/0029 (EP);
B30B1/103 (EP);
B30B15/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNIEHEBELPRESSE | [2019/31] | English: | TOGGLE PRESS | [2019/31] | French: | PRESSE À GENOUILLÈRE | [2019/31] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 26.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US609606 (C.P.BELL) [X] 1-3 * page 1 - page 2; figure - *; | [XYI]DE40962 (C.MÜLLER) [X] 1-6,8,10 * page 1 - page 2 * [Y] 7,9 [I] 12,13; | [X]CN102172759 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG) [X] 1,2,11 * figure - *; | [X]WO2012096339 (AMADA CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * figure 12 *; | [Y]DE202004016837U (HAULICK & ROOS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7,9 * paragraph [0052]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0765735 (BRUDERER AG [CH]) [A] 4-10 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE9162 (H. HAMMER) [A] 1-13 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE3315892 |