EP3415121 - RADIAL CUTTER IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medi-Tate Ltd. 1 Leshem Street, P.O. Box 720 82000 Kiriat Gat / IL | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kilemnik, Ido 35 Derech Harishonim 4286500 Haniel / IL | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Schuhmann, Albrecht c/o Merten Patentmanagement Alexanderstrasse 1 90547 Stein / DE | [2018/51] | Application number, filing date | 18000435.0 | 22.12.2009 | [2018/51] | Priority number, date | US20080139718P | 22.12.2008 Original published format: US 139718 P | US20090288426P | 21.12.2009 Original published format: US 288426 P | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415121 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3415121 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/86, A61B17/3207, A61F2/94, // A61B17/00, A61F2/04, A61B17/12, A61B17/3209, A61F2/00, A61B18/00, A61B17/29 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
A61B17/320725 (EP,IL,US);
A61F2/94 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2017/00274 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2017/2945 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2017/32096 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00547 (EP,IL,US);
A61F2002/048 (EP,IL,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,IL,US);
A61F2230/0058 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/51] | A61F2/86, A61B17/3207, // A61B17/00, A61F2/04, A61B17/12, A61B17/3209, A61F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Title | German: | RADIALES SCHNEIDEIMPLANTAT | [2018/51] | English: | RADIAL CUTTER IMPLANT | [2018/51] | French: | IMPLANT DE COUPE RADIALE | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/51] | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 17.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09809039.2 / EP2370029 | Divisional application(s) | EP23000113.3 / EP4295816 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.03.2022 | Decision despatched | 25.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 25.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.08.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | LU | 22.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5601591 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 17 - line 59; figures 1-4, 9, 10 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 21 *; | [A]US2003114877 (GELLMAN BARRY N [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] *; | [A]WO2004078065 (SINUS RHYTHM TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 17a,b, 27; claim 1 *; | [I]US2005015129 (MISCHE HANS A [US]) [I] 1-6 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005]; figures 1,6 * * paragraph [0039] *; | [A]WO2008136005 (MEDI TATE [IL], et al) [A] 1 * page 9, line 2 - page 23, line 4; figures 1-19 * * abstract *; | [A]US2008300594 (GOTO HIROAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [E]WO2010073244 (MEDI TATE [IL], et al) [E] 1-6* the whole document * | by applicant | US5209725 | US5499994 | WO2006040767 |