EP3342606 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hankook Tire Co., Ltd. 133, Teheran-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06133 / KR | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUN, Eun Chang 107-1202, 63, Gajeong-ro, Yuseong-gu 34119 Daejeon / KR | 02 /
KIM, Yong Keun 101-1204, 124, Jijokdong-ro, Yuseong-gu 34075 Daejeon / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Myeong Rak 204, 14, Songnim-ro 54beon-gil, Yuseong-gu 34098 Daejeon / KR | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18150107.3 | 02.01.2018 | [2018/27] | Priority number, date | KR20170000819 | 03.01.2017 Original published format: KR 20170000819 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3342606 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60C13/02, B60C13/00 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
B60C13/023 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60C23/19 (KR,US);
B60C13/00 (CN);
B60C11/01 (US);
B60C13/002 (EP,US);
B60C13/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFEN | [2018/27] | English: | TIRE | [2018/27] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2018/27] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 02.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6460584 (DE LABAREYRE BERTRAND GARNIER [FR]); | [X]US2009229727 (LOSEY ROBERT ALLEN [US], et al); | [X]JP2013028284 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [X]US2013174955 (YASUNAGA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) | by applicant | KR20100123226 |