EP3349146 - GROUND CLASSIFIER SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATED VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | [2018/51] |
Former [2018/29] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies LLC P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, Ronald M. 7957 East 50 South Greentown, Indiana 46936 / US | 02 /
IZZAT, Izzat H. 483 Pesaro Street Oak Park, California 91377 / US | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | Robert, Vincent, et al Delphi Automotive France SAS Aptiv EMEA Patent Department Bâtiment Le Raspail - Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations, CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18150829.2 | 09.01.2018 | [2018/29] | Priority number, date | US201715407404 | 17.01.2017 Original published format: US201715407404 | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3349146 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/32, G06K9/46, G06K9/62 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (EP,CN,US);
G01S17/86 (US);
G01S7/4802 (US);
G06F18/214 (CN);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06N3/045 (CN);
G06T7/11 (US);
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
G06V10/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2018/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENKLASSIFIZIERERSYSTEM FÜR AUTOMATISIERTE FAHRZEUGE | [2018/29] | English: | GROUND CLASSIFIER SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATED VEHICLES | [2018/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CLASSIFICATION AU SOL POUR VÉHICULES AUTOMATISÉS | [2018/29] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 18.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2020 | 13.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.04.2021 | 22.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/40] | 29.05.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - LAIBLE STEFAN ET AL, "Terrain classification with conditional random fields on fused 3D LIDAR and camera data", 2013 EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON MOBILE ROBOTS, IEEE, (20130925), doi:10.1109/ECMR.2013.6698838, pages 172 - 177, XP032548183 [X] 1,2,7 * abstract * * sec. IV, par. 1 * * sec. IV (A) * [I] 3-6,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECMR.2013.6698838 | [ ] - Stefan Laible ET AL, "3D LIDAR- and Camera-Based Terrain Classification Under Different Lighting Conditions", INFORMATIK AKTUELL., GB, SPRINGER VERLAG, LONDON., (20120101), pages 21 - 29, doi:10.1007/978-3-642-32217-4_3, ISSN 1431-472X, XP055474283 [ ] * sec. 4.1(features) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-32217-4_3 | [A] - Marcel Häselich ET AL, "Terrain Classification with Markov Random Fields on fused Camera and 3D Laser Range Data", (20120801), URL: http://aass.oru.se/Agora/ECMR2011/proceedings/papers/ECMR2011_0025.pdf, (20180511), XP055474414 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |