EP3511522 - GAS TURBINE BLADE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eshak, Daniel M. 1760 Bonita Avenue Orlando, FL 32805 / US | 02 /
Kamenzky, Susanne Mannheimer Straße 35 10713 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Lohaus, Andrew Schönfließer Str 2 10439 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Miller, Jr., Samuel R. 645 S.W. Lake Charles Circle Port St. Lucie, 34986 / US | 05 /
Vöhringer, Daniel Darser Str. 49 14167 Berlin / DE | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 18151215.3 | 11.01.2018 | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3511522 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D5/18 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
F01D5/147 (EP,KR,US);
F01D5/187 (EP,KR);
F01D5/18 (US);
F05D2230/10 (EP,KR);
F05D2230/21 (EP,KR,US);
F05D2240/301 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASTURBINENSCHAUFEL UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN SOLCH EINER SCHAUFEL | [2019/29] | English: | GAS TURBINE BLADE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH BLADE | [2019/29] | French: | AUBE DE TURBINE À GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE TELLE AUBE | [2019/29] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 07.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1007565 (HOLZWARTH GASTURBINEN G M B H) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 39 - line 46; claim 1 *; | [A]US6257828 (BISCHOFF-BEIERMANN BURKHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-13* column 6, line 9 - line 44; figure 2 *; | [A]US8720526 (CAMPBELL CHRISTIAN X [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 19 - line 67; figures 1-4; claims 1, 10 *; | [A]US2016237827 (CAMPBELL CHRISTIAN XAVIER [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 24] * |