EP3512163 - TRANSMISSION OF SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraus, Ludwig Zum Holzfeld 4 94099 Ruhstorf / DE | 02 /
Maul, Christian Steigerwaldstr. 15 90409 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Müller, Volker Innere Kobergerstraße 11 90408 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 18151421.7 | 12.01.2018 | [2019/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3512163 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
H04L12/40 (EP,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGEN VON SIGNALEN | [2019/29] | English: | TRANSMISSION OF SIGNALS | [2019/29] | French: | TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAUX | [2019/29] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 05.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29809721U (BAUMUELLER ANLAGEN SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [A] 1-15* page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 25 *; | [XAI]EP3076250 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-5 * [A] 10-15 [I] 2-9; | [XAI]DE102014019725 (BLOCK TRANSFORMATOREN-ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0062]; figures 1-3 * [A] 10-15 [I] 2-9 |