EP3339052 - METHOD FOR DECORATING SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE | [2022/44] |
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUTZ, Norbert Am Waldfriedhof 7 90607 Rückersdorf / DE | 02 /
KURZ, Walter Sperberstraße 45 90768 Fürth / DE | 03 /
BREHM, Ludwig Vogtlandstr. 16 91325 Adelsdorf / DE | 04 /
BEZOLD, Hans Peter Karl-Winkler-Str. 6 92237 Sulzbach-Rosenberg / DE | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 18151556.0 | 24.06.2011 | [2018/26] | Priority number, date | DE20101025278 | 28.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010025278 | DE20101048817 | 20.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010048817 | [2018/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3339052 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3339052 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/328, B42D25/405, B42D25/425, B42D25/47, B44C1/17, B44F1/10, B42D15/00 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
B44C1/1729 (EP,US);
B23P19/04 (US);
B41M5/38214 (US);
B41M5/405 (US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/36 (EP,US);
B42D25/364 (EP,US);
B42D25/405 (EP,US);
B42D25/425 (EP,US);
B42D25/47 (EP,US);
B44C1/10 (US);
B44C1/1733 (EP,US);
B44F1/10 (EP,US);
G09F3/00 (US);
B41M2205/42 (US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/26] | B44C1/17, B44F1/10, B42D15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DEKORATION VON OBERFLÄCHEN | [2018/26] | English: | METHOD FOR DECORATING SURFACES | [2018/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCORATION DE SURFACES | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 15.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11727928.1 / EP2585314 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | ES | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | NL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SE | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | IE | 24.06.2023 | LU | 24.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
IE | 24.06.2023 | ||
LU | 24.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 24.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | DK | 02.11.2022 | |
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 02.11.2022 | |
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4433858 (KURZ LEONHARD FA [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 62; figure 1 *; | [A]DE29807638U (KURZ LEONHARD FA [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 4; figure 11 *; | [A]EP1241618 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP1264704 (VENETA DECALCOGOMME S R L [IT]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020] *; | [A]DE10241803 (UTSCH AG ERICH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004041546 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 6 - page 8 * |