EP3332789 - CLADRIBINE REGIMEN FOR TREATING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Serono SA Centre Industriel 1267 Coinsins, Vaud / CH | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Luca, Giampiero Chemin de Conches 15B 1231 Conches / CH | 02 /
Ythier, Amaud Route de Vireloup 88 1239 Collex-Bossy Geneva / CH | 03 /
Munafo, Alain Rue des Creuses 12 1182 Gilly / CH | 04 /
Lopez-Bresnahan, Maria 145 South Great Road Lincoln, MA, 01773 / US | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Dotzauer, Matthias Stephan Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 18151634.5 | 20.12.2005 | [2018/24] | Priority number, date | US20040638669P | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 638669 P | EP20040106909 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: EP 04106909 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3332789 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3332789 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7076, A61K38/21, A61P25/00, A61P25/28 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A61K38/21 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/7076 (EP,US);
A61K38/215 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7076, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/215, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/21, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/24] | A61K31/7076, A61K38/21, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/24] | Title | German: | CLADRIBINKUR ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MULTIPLER SKLEROSE | [2018/24] | English: | CLADRIBINE REGIMEN FOR TREATING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS | [2018/24] | French: | POSOLOGIE DE LA CLADRIBINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA SCLÉROSE EN PLAQUES | [2018/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 13.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.10.2021 | 14.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05823474.1 / EP1827461 | EP10182676.6 / EP2263678 | EP14001970.4 / EP2805723 | Divisional application(s) | EP22166610.0 / EP4070800 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.12.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 02.12.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.12.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0626853 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US]) [AD] 1-16 * page 3, paragraph 23 * * page 4, paragraphs 25,30 * * page 8, paragraphs 62-66,71-73 * * page 8, paragraph 74 - page 9, paragraph 75 ** page 9, paragraph 78 *; | [XD]WO2004087101 (IVAX CORP [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,7-9,13-15,17 * page 5, lines 1-7 * * page 12, lines 4-12 * * page 23, lines 15-28 * * page 24, lines 10-26 * * page 33, line 24 - page 34, line 2; example 4 * * page 36, line 17 - page 37, line 2; example 5 * * claims 25,28,36,39 *; | [XD] - GRIEB PAWEL ET AL, "Effect of repeated treatments with cladribine (2-chlorodeoxyadenosine) on blood counts in multiple sclerosis patients", ARCHIVUM IMMUNOLOGIAE ET THERAPIAE EXPERIMENTALIS, (1995), vol. 43, no. 5-6, ISSN 0004-069X, pages 323 - 327, XP008047072 [XD] 1,7-9,13-16 * abstract * * page 324, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 326, column 2, paragraph 3 * | [XD] - STELMASIAK Z ET AL, "A pilot trial of cladribine (2-chlorodeoxyadenosine) in remitting- relapsing multiple sclerosis", MEDICAL SCIENCE MONITOR 1998 POLAND, (1998), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1234-1010, pages 4 - 8, XP008047060 [XD] 1,7-9,13-16 * abstract * * page 5, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 7, column 1, paragraph 3 * | [XA] - LANGTRY H D ET AL, "Cladribine: A review of its use in multiple sclerosis", BIODRUGS 1998 NEW ZEALAND, (1998), vol. 9, no. 5, ISSN 1173-8804, pages 419 - 433, XP008047073 [X] 1,7-9,13-16 * page 422, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 423, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 423, column 2, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 424, column 1, paragraph 5 * * table III * * page 430, column 1, paragraph 3 * * table IV * [A] 17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00063030-199809050-00006 | [A] - ELLISON GEORGE W ET AL, "Oral cladribine for multiple sclerosis", NEUROLOGY, & 49TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NEUROLOGY; BOSTON, MASSACHUSETTS, USA; APRIL 12-19, 1997, (1997), vol. 48, no. 3 SUPPL. 2, ISSN 0028-3878, pages A174 - A175, XP008047069 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | - LILIEMARK JAN, "The clinical pharmacokinetics of cladribine", CLINICAL PHARMACOKINETICS, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD., AUCKLAND, NZ, (19970201), vol. 32, no. 2, doi:10.2165/00003088-199732020-00003, ISSN 0312-5963, pages 120 - 131, XP008134580 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003088-199732020-00003 | by applicant | EP0173059 | US5208327 | US5506214 | WO9619230 | WO9619229 | EP0626853 | WO0064918 | US6194395 | WO2004028462 | WO2004087100 | WO2004087101 | - LUBLIN; REINGOLD, Neurology, (19960000), vol. 46, pages 907 - 911 | - LASSMANN et al., Trends Mol. Med., (20010000), vol. 7, pages 115 - 121 | - LUCCHINETTI et al., Curr. Opin. Neurol., (20010000), vol. 14, pages 259 - 269 | - NOSEWORTHY et al., The New England Journal of Medicine, (20000000), vol. 343, no. 13, pages 938 - 952 | - MC DONALD et al., Ann. Neurol., (20010000), vol. 50, pages 121 - 127 | - SELBY et al., Can. J. Neurol. Sci., (19980000), vol. 25, pages 295 - 299 | - ROMINE et al., Proceedings of the Association of American Physicians, (19990000), vol. 111, no. 1, pages 35 - 44 | - RICE, Neurology, (20000000), vol. 54, no. 5, pages 1145 - 1155 | - BEUTLER et al., Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci. USA, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 1716 - 1720 | - BEUTLER et al., Acta hematol., (19940000), vol. 91, pages 10 - 15 | - BEUTLER et al., Seminars in Hematology, (19960000), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 45 - 52 | - GRIEB et al., Archivum Immunologiae et Therapiae Experimentalis, (19950000), vol. 43, no. 5-6, pages 323 - 327 | - SIPE et al., Lancet, (19940000), vol. 344, pages 9 - 13 | - STELMASIAK et al., Laboratory Investigations, (19980000), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 4 - 8 | - SCHUMACHER et al., Ann. NY Acad. Sci., (19650000), vol. 122, pages 552 - 568 | - POSER et al., Ann. Neurol., (19830000), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 227 - 31 | - MILLER et al., Neurology, (19960000), vol. 47, no. 4, page 217 | - EVANS et al., Ann. Neurology, (19970000), vol. 41, pages 125 - 132 | - SIPE et al., Neurology, (19840000), vol. 34, pages 1368 - 1372 | - MATTSON, Expert Rev. Neurotherapeutics, (20020000), pages 319 - 328 | - KURTZKE, Neurology, (19830000), vol. 33, pages 1444 - 1452 | - ROBINS et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19840000), vol. 106, page 6379 |