EP3372956 - MEMS DEVICE WITH IN-PLANE QUADRATURE COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP USA, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin TX 78735 / US | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEISBERGER, Aaron A. NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Pomper, Till NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group 134 avenue Eisenhower BP 72329 31023 Toulouse Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18152373.9 | 18.01.2018 | [2018/37] | Priority number, date | US201715450616 | 06.03.2017 Original published format: US201715450616 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3372956 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3372956 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/5733, G01C19/5726 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
G01C19/5726 (EP,US);
G01P3/44 (CN);
G01C19/5776 (US);
G01C19/5733 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEMS-VORRICHTUNG MIT QUADRATURKOMPENSATION AUF EINER EBENE | [2018/37] | English: | MEMS DEVICE WITH IN-PLANE QUADRATURE COMPENSATION | [2018/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEMS DOTÉ D'UNE COMPENSATION DE QUADRATURE DANS LE PLAN | [2018/37] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2071284 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-14C * * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] - [0024] , [0031] , [0037] , [0039] , [0041] , [0044] , [0057] ** claims 1-10 *; | [X]EP2743639 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8,10 * abstract * * figures 1-27 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0079] , [0089] - [0096] - [0122] * * claims 1-7 *; | [X]US2016097642 (OKAMI TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0041] , [0043] , [0050] * * claims 1-18 * |