EP3345928 - HUMAN CD3 BINDING ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merus N.V. Yalelaan 62 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bakker, Alexander Berthold Hendrik c/o Merus N. V. Yalelaan 62 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | 02 /
Van Loo, Pieter Fokko c/o Merus N.V. Yalelaan 62 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | [2019/04] |
Former [2018/28] | 01 /
Bakker, Alexander Berthold Hendrik c/o Padualaan 8, postvak 133 3584 CH Utrecht / NL | ||
02 /
Van Loo, Pieter Fokko c/o Padualaan 8, postvak 133 3584 CH Utrecht / NL | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 18152578.3 | 08.07.2016 | [2018/28] | Priority number, date | EP20150176355 | 10.07.2015 Original published format: EP 15176355 | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345928 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3345928 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, // A61K39/00 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
C07K16/2809 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/39591 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07K16/2851 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (KR,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/51 (KR,US);
C07K2317/515 (US);
C07K2317/52 (KR);
C07K2317/524 (EP,US);
C07K2317/526 (EP,US);
C07K2317/53 (KR,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/71 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2317/734 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | HUMANES CD3 BINDENDER ANTIKÖRPER | [2018/28] | English: | HUMAN CD3 BINDING ANTIBODY | [2018/28] | French: | ANTICORPS DE LIAISON CD3 HUMAIN | [2018/28] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 19.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16178648.8 / EP3115376 | Divisional application(s) | EP20174449.7 / EP3757129 | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 07.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.03.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 07.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.03.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2016 | AL | 24.06.2020 | AT | 24.06.2020 | CY | 24.06.2020 | CZ | 24.06.2020 | DK | 24.06.2020 | EE | 24.06.2020 | FI | 24.06.2020 | HR | 24.06.2020 | LT | 24.06.2020 | LV | 24.06.2020 | MC | 24.06.2020 | MK | 24.06.2020 | MT | 24.06.2020 | PL | 24.06.2020 | RO | 24.06.2020 | RS | 24.06.2020 | SE | 24.06.2020 | SI | 24.06.2020 | SK | 24.06.2020 | SM | 24.06.2020 | TR | 24.06.2020 | LU | 08.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 24.09.2020 | NO | 24.09.2020 | GR | 25.09.2020 | IS | 24.10.2020 | PT | 26.10.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.07.2016 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MT | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
TR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 08.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 08.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 08.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
LU | 08.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 24.06.2020 | |
NO | 24.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2014061433 (IHI CORP [JP]) [AD] 1-19* See examples;; claims 1-27 * | by applicant | US2003078385 | WO2004009618 | WO2005118635 | WO2009157771 | WO2013157954 | WO2014051433 | US9248181 | US9358286 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. Q02223 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P15391 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P11836 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P28908 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P20138 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P28907 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P16070 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. 075794 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P18827 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P06731 | - BAKKER A. et al., Cancer Res., (20040000), vol. 64, pages 8843 - 8850 | - pROTEIN, Database accession no. AY547296 | - Protein, Database accession no. AF247788 | - A.S. MARSHALL et al., J Biol Chem, (20040000), vol. 279, pages 14792 - 14802 | - Gene, Database accession no. AY498550 | - Y.HAN et al., Blood, (20040000), vol. 104, pages 2858 - 2866 | - Gene, Database accession no. AY426759 | - C.H.CHEN et al., Blood, (20060000), vol. 107, pages 1459 - 1467 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. Q5QGZ9 | - VAN RHENEN et al., Blood, (20070000), vol. 110, page 2659 | - MOSHAVER et al., Stem Cells, (20080000), vol. 26, page 3059 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. 075390 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P00533 | - Oncogene, (20130523), vol. 32, no. 21, pages 2670 - 2681 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. Q9NYJ7 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. Q13421 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P15328 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P41439 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P16422 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P04626 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. Q10589 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. P49901 | - UniProtKB, Database accession no. Q04609 | - SPIESS, C. et al., "Alternative molecular formats and therapeutic applications for bispecific antibodies", Mol. Immunol., (20150000), URL: http: //dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2015.01.003 | - CUI et al., JBC, (20120000), vol. 287, pages 28206 - 28214 | - KONTERMANN, MABS, (20120000), vol. 4, pages 182 - 197 | - CHAMES; BATY, MABS, (20090000), vol. 1, pages 539 - 547 | - MOORE et al., Blood, (20110000), vol. 117, pages 4542 - 4551 | - LOFFLER et al., Blood, (20000000), vol. 95, page 2098 | - ZEIDLER et al., J. Immunol., (19990000), vol. 163, page 1246 | - GUNASEKARAN et al., JBC, (20100000), vol. 285, pages 19637 - 19646 | - SALI et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19930000), vol. 234, pages 779 - 815 | - LIU et al., Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (20080000), vol. 97, pages 2426 - 2447 | - DE KRUIF et al., Biotechnol Bioeng, (20100000), vol. 106, pages 741 - 750 |