EP3329949 - BREASTSHIELD UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/23] | BREAST HOOD UNIT | ||
[2019/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medela Holding AG Lättichstrasse 4b 6340 Baar / CH | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURRER, Etienne Eichstrasse 18 6330 Cham / CH | 02 /
RIGERT, Mario Unterdorfstrasse 9a 6033 Buchrain / CH | 03 /
SCHLIENGER, André Ausserdorfstrasse 35 8933 Maschwanden / CH | [2019/27] |
Former [2018/23] | 01 /
FURRER, Etienne Eichstrasse 18 6330 Cham / CH | ||
02 /
RIGERT, Mario Unterdorfstrasse9a 6033 Buchrain / CH | |||
03 /
SCHLIENGER, André Ausserdorfstrasse 35 8933 Maschwanden / CH | Representative(s) | Clerc, Natalia Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2018/23] | Application number, filing date | 18153426.4 | 12.12.2013 | [2018/23] | Priority number, date | CH20120002840 | 18.12.2012 Original published format: CH 28402012 | [2018/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3329949 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3329949 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/06 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
A61M1/064 (EP,US);
A61M1/066 (EP,US);
A61M1/78 (EP,US);
A61M2205/75 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2018/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BRUSTHAUBENEINHEIT | [2018/23] | English: | BREASTSHIELD UNIT | [2019/47] | French: | UNITE DE TETERELLE | [2019/47] |
Former [2018/23] | BREAST HOOD UNIT | ||
Former [2018/23] | TIRE-LAIT | Examination procedure | 22.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 22.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 23.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13811343.6 / EP2934616 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2013 | AL | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | ES | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | IT | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | PL | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | AT | 12.12.2019 | IE | 12.12.2019 | LU | 12.12.2019 | FR | 04.02.2020 | BG | 04.03.2020 | NO | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.12.2013 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 12.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 12.12.2013 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 12.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 12.12.2013 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 12.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 12.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 04.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19816776 (KAWECO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 9 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [X]US2003004459 (MCKENDRY BRUCE [US], et al) [X] 10 * paragraphs [0036] - [0052] * * figures 3-5, 7 *; | [A]DE202006019416U (MAPA GMBH GUMMI PLASTIKWERKE [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0058] - [0064] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2007060873 (HIRAOKA KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0024] - [0037] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [X]WO2010054174 (SIMPLISSE INC [US], et al) [X] 10 * paragraphs [0072] - [0079] - [0 86] ** figures 2, 3, 6-8 *; | [A]EP2308523 (MEDELA HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0080] , [ 143] - [0147] * * figures 10, 11, 23 * | by applicant | US5571084 | WO2011007140 | WO2011037841 |