EP3357675 - APPLICATOR SYSTEMS FOR APPLYING PRESSURE TO A STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOCKEMEYER, Matthew Harper 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY New York 12309-1027 / US | 02 /
JEONG, Younkoo 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY New York 12309-1027 / US | 03 /
BOLLACKER, James Duvall 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY New York 12309-1027 / US | 04 /
SINHA, Shatil General Electric Company Global Research One Research Circle, Bldg, K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | Foster, Christopher Michael, et al General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 18154127.7 | 30.01.2018 | [2018/32] | Priority number, date | US201715426784 | 07.02.2017 Original published format: US201715426784 | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357675 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/46, B29C33/54, B29C70/44, B29C70/54 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
B29C33/54 (EP,US);
B30B1/003 (CN);
B21D26/021 (CN);
B29C33/3821 (US);
B29C70/44 (EP,US);
B29C70/46 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/32] | B29C70/46, B29C33/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] |
Former [2018/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APPLIKATORSYSTEME ZUR DRUCKBEAUFSCHLAGUNG EINER STRUKTUR | [2018/32] | English: | APPLICATOR SYSTEMS FOR APPLYING PRESSURE TO A STRUCTURE | [2018/32] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'APPLICATEUR PERMETTANT D'APPLIQUER UNE PRESSION SUR UNE STRUCTURE | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 08.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2066806 (SHOE & ALLIED TRADES RES ASS) [A] 1-15* page 9, line 37 - page 10, line 28; figures 5-7 *; | [XA]EP2803471 (TRUMPF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 67] , [0069] , [0071] , [0072]; figure 1 * [A] 1-14 |