EP3372975 - LEAK DETECTION FOR FLUID DISTRIBUTION NETWORKS USING HYPERSPECTRAL IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Solutions Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dudek, Marian 1301 Fannin, Ste 1900 Houston, TX Texas 77079 / US | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2018/37] | Application number, filing date | 18154754.8 | 01.02.2018 | [2018/37] | Priority number, date | US201715452221 | 07.03.2017 Original published format: US201715452221 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3372975 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3372975 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3372975 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/38, G01M3/00, G01N33/00, G01N21/25, G06T7/00, H04N7/18, G01M3/04, G01N21/31, G01N21/17, G01M17/007 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
G01N33/0047 (EP,US);
G01M3/04 (US);
G01M17/007 (EP,US);
G01M3/38 (EP,US);
G01N21/31 (EP,US);
G01N33/004 (EP,US);
G06T7/0004 (EP,US);
H04N7/188 (EP,US);
G01N2021/1793 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30108 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/49] | G01M3/38, G01M3/00, G01N33/00, G01N21/25, G06T7/00, H04N7/18, G01M3/04 | ||
Former IPC [2018/37] | G01M3/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] |
Former [2018/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LECKERKENNUNG FÜR FLUIDVERTEILUNGSNETZE MIT HYPERSPECTRAL IMAGING | [2018/37] | English: | LEAK DETECTION FOR FLUID DISTRIBUTION NETWORKS USING HYPERSPECTRAL IMAGING | [2018/37] | French: | DETECTION DE FUITE POUR DES RESEAUX DE DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE UTILISANT UNE IMAGERIE HYPERSPECTRALE | [2018/37] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 04.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2018 | AL | 15.04.2020 | AT | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | DK | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | ES | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | HR | 15.04.2020 | IT | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | MK | 15.04.2020 | MT | 15.04.2020 | PL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | RS | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | SM | 15.04.2020 | TR | 15.04.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | NO | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | IS | 15.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 01.02.2018 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MK | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 01.02.2018 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MK | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 01.02.2018 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015323449 (JONES BRIAN BUTLER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-14 * abstract * * figure 1(a) * [I] 3,7,15; | [A]US9234618 (ZHU JIAJUN [US], et al) [A] 7,15 * abstract * * column 13, line 18 - line 55 * * figure 2 *; | [A]CN204990697U (PUTIAN YUNCHI NEW ENERGY AUTOMOBILE RES INST CO LTD) [A] 7,15* abstract * |