EP3520759 - MEDICAL VEHICLE FOR PROVIDING MEDICAL CARE TO PATIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grupo Gasmedi, S.L. Calle Orense, Nº34, 3ª Planta 28020 Madrid / ES | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUENGO, Marta GRUPO GASMEDI, S.L. Calle Orense, Nº34, 3ª Planta E-28020 Madrid / ES | 02 /
MONSEGUR, Jean Francois GRUPO GASMEDI, S.L. Calle Orense, Nº34, 3ª Planta E-28020 Madrid / ES | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Pittis, Olivier L'Air Liquide S.A. 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18155282.9 | 06.02.2018 | [2019/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3520759 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61G3/00, A61M15/00, // A61G3/06, A61G3/08 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
A61G3/001 (EP);
A61G3/005 (EP);
A61G3/008 (EP);
A61G3/061 (EP);
A61G3/0808 (EP);
A61G2210/70 (EP);
A61G2210/90 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] |
Former [2019/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCH AUSGESTATTETES FAHRZEUG ZUR MEDIZINISCHEN VERSORGUNG VON PATIENTEN | [2019/32] | English: | MEDICAL VEHICLE FOR PROVIDING MEDICAL CARE TO PATIENTS | [2019/32] | French: | VÉHICULE MÉDICALISÉ POUR FOURNIR DES SOINS MÉDICAUX À DES PATIENTS | [2019/32] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 07.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4743059 (LEGUEU PAUL [FR]) [X] 1,15 * column 2 - column 3 ** figures 1-5 *; | [XY]EP0278626 (ISHII YASUHIKO) [X] 1 * column 2 - column 4 * * figures 1-8 * [Y] 7; | [XYI]US2009218108 (CANO MIGUEL J [US]) [X] 1-6,8-14 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0074] * * figures 1-9 * [Y] 7 [I] 15; | [X]WO2013078162 (MED1 PARTNERS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 6 - page 17 * * figures 1-12 *; | [XI]EP2762120 (BINZ AMBULANCE UND UMWELTTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,10,12-14 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 1-8 * [I] 4,8,9,11,15 |