EP3358842 - IMAGING DISPLAY SYSTEM AND RIDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIOHARA, Ryuichi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 18155536.8 | 07.02.2018 | [2018/32] | Priority number, date | JP20170020133 | 07.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017020133 | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358842 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18, B60R1/00 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
H04N7/181 (EP,US);
G08G1/166 (US);
B60R1/26 (EP,US);
B60R11/04 (US);
G06V20/588 (US);
G08G1/01 (US);
H04N7/18 (US);
B60R1/27 (EP,US);
B60R2300/105 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] |
Former [2018/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSANZEIGESYSTEM UND REITVORRICHTUNG | [2018/32] | English: | IMAGING DISPLAY SYSTEM AND RIDING DEVICE | [2018/32] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGERIE ET DISPOSITIF DE MONTURE | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 08.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2016093117 (JAPAN DISPLAY INC [JP]) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | [X]WO2016179303 (KAMAMA INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 7 * * paragraphs [0029] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0089] - [0112] *; | [P]US2017272702 (OZAWA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [P] * abstract * * figure 8 * * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0059] ** paragraphs [0084] - [0104] * | by applicant | JP2007129290 | JP2016040904 |