EP3524087 - HAIR STYLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPOORENDONK, Wouter Hendrik Cornelis Philips IP&S High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BRADA, Ype Bernardus Philips IP&S High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
ZJIROECHA, Nikolaj Vasiljevitsj Philips IP&S High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
VERHAGEN, Rieko Philips IP&S High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
COOMBS, James Howard Philips IP&S High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/33] | Application number, filing date | 18155698.6 | 08.02.2018 | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3524087 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A45D2/00 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
A45D19/0066 (EP);
A45D2/002 (EP);
A45D2200/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAARSTYLINGVORRICHTUNG | [2019/33] | English: | HAIR STYLING DEVICE | [2019/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COIFFURE | [2019/33] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 11.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013190484 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-9 * page 4, line 8 - page 9; figure - *; | [X]JP2004159727 (KUWABARA SEIJI) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]CN104970534 (SIPLED ZHANGJIAKOU CO LTD) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2017153121 | EP20170190265 | EP20170190268 | EP20170190269 |