EP3361248 - METHOD FOR THE DETERMINATION OF PROCESSING INFLUENCES ON THE NUTRITIONAL VALUE OF FEEDSTUFF RAW MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2019/50] |
Former [2018/33] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiltafsky, Markus Hüttenberger Str. 64 63776 Mömbris / DE | 02 /
Reimann, Ingolf Albert-Schweitzer-Str. 19 64354 Reinheim / DE | 03 /
Fickler, Johann Langgasse 8 63853 Mömlingen / DE | 04 /
Rademacher-Heilshorn, Meike Eichenkamp 1a 27628 Wulsbüttel / DE | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 18156218.2 | 12.02.2018 | [2018/33] | Priority number, date | US201715431597 | 13.02.2017 Original published format: US201715431597 | EP20170155896 | 13.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17155896 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3361248 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3361248 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/02, A23K10/00, A23K40/00, A23K30/00, G06K17/00 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
A23K10/30 (EP,US);
G01N33/02 (US);
A23K20/142 (EP,US);
A23K50/00 (US);
A23K50/10 (EP);
A23K50/30 (EP);
A23K50/75 (EP);
G01N21/3563 (US);
G01N21/359 (US);
G06K17/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON VERARBEITUNGSEINFLÜSSEN AUF DIE QUALITÄT VON FUTTERMITTELROHMATERIALIEN | [2018/33] | English: | METHOD FOR THE DETERMINATION OF PROCESSING INFLUENCES ON THE NUTRITIONAL VALUE OF FEEDSTUFF RAW MATERIALS | [2018/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTERMINATION DU TRAITEMENT DES INFLUENCES SUR LA QUALITÉ DES MATIÈRES PREMIÈRES D'ALIMENTS POUR ANIMAUX | [2018/33] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | LU | 12.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | BG | 18.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | HR | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | LT | 18.12.2019 | |
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 18.12.2019 | |
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9702489 (UNIV MASSEY [NZ], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * * page 2, line 25 - page 6, line 20 *; | [A]US5783238 (JULIEN WILLIAM E [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0115548 (AVENTIS ANIMAL NUTRITION SA [FR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * * claims 1, 7, 8 *; | [A]EP1145645 (AVENTIS ANIMAL NUTRITION SA [FR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]NZ312221 (PIG RES & DEV CORP, et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010247707 (KOBLER CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011109624 (SCHILLINGER GENETICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * * page 9, lines 10-11 * * page 42; claim 13(d) *; | [A] - RICHARD MILLS, "Evonik's Amino NIR - NIR for the feed industry", Hillerød Denmark, (20121024), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://nirperformance.com/2012/10/24/evoniks-amino-nir/, (20160912), XP055301934 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - Galen J Rokey ET AL, "Feed extrusion process description", (20100101), pages 510 - 518, URL: http://www.scielo.br/pdf/rbz/v39sspe/55.pdf, (20170609), XP055380349 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1590/S1516-35982010001300055 | [A] - Alfred Hickling, "Canadian Feed Peas Industry Guide", GUARDIAN, GB, GUARDIAN NEWSPAPERS, LONDON,, (20120418), pages 1 - 16, ISSN 0261-3077, XP055322748 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9702489 | US5783238 | WO0115548 | EP1145645 | NZ312221 | WO2011109624 | - GALEN J. ROKEY et al., "Feed extrusion process description", Revista Brasileira de Zootecnia, (20100000), vol. 39, pages 510 - 518 |