EP3367390 - ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE CARBON NANOTUBE WIRE HAVING A METALLIC COATING AND METHODS OF FORMING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | [2018/51] |
Former [2018/35] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies LLC P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHMOND, Zachary, J 5560 Oak Hill Dr. NW Warren, Ohio 44481 / US | 02 /
RUBINO, Evangelia 2155 Rolling Meadows Drive NE Warren, Ohio 44484 / US | 03 /
SACCO, Gina 2743 North Road Warren, OHIO 44483 / US | 04 /
DREW, George, A 1995 CELESTIAL DRIVE Warren, Ohio 44484 / US | 05 /
CHURLEY, Gregory, V 255 TERRE HILL DRIVE CORTLAND, Ohio 44410 / US | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstrasse 79 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Robert, Vincent, et al Aptiv Services France SAS Aptiv EMEA Patent Department Bâtiment Le Raspail - Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations, CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18156527.6 | 13.02.2018 | [2018/35] | Priority number, date | US201715441599 | 24.02.2017 Original published format: US201715441599 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3367390 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/02, H01B1/04 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
H01B1/04 (EP,CN,US);
H01B1/02 (CN);
H01B1/026 (EP,US);
H01B13/00 (CN);
H01B13/0016 (US);
H01B13/0036 (US);
H01B5/02 (CN);
H01B5/08 (CN,US);
H01B7/02 (US);
H01R4/023 (US);
H01R4/184 (US);
H01R43/02 (US);
H01R43/048 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGER KOHLENSTOFF-NANORÖHRCHEN-DRAHT MIT METALLISCHER BESCHICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG DAVON | [2018/35] | English: | ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE CARBON NANOTUBE WIRE HAVING A METALLIC COATING AND METHODS OF FORMING SAME | [2018/35] | French: | FIL DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE ÉLECTRIQUEMENT CONDUCTEUR PRÉSENTANT UN REVÊTEMENT MÉTALLIQUE ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE FORMATION | [2018/35] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 28.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 20.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009194313 (JIANG KAI-LI [CN], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1,3,4,10-11; claims 1-23 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0070] * [I] 9-13; | [XI] - HANNULA PYRY-MIKKO ET AL, "Carbon nanotube-copper composites by electrodeposition on carbon nanotube fibers", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, (20160603), vol. 107, doi:10.1016/J.CARBON.2016.06.008, ISSN 0008-6223, pages 281 - 287, XP029644361 [X] 1-4,6-9 * Abstract; section Experimental;; figure 6 * [I] 5,10-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2016.06.008 |