EP3367027 - Glass assembly, in particular as a component of a refrigeration appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAN-DUR Holding GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Strasse 1 97944 Boxberg / DE | [2020/50] |
Former [2018/35] | For all designated states PAN-DUR Holding GmbH & Co. KG Schillerstrasse 9 74747 Ravenstein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISS, Albert Schillerstrasse 9 74747 Ravenstein / DE | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Despag-Straße 6 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Baudler, Ron Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 18156591.2 | 14.02.2018 | [2018/35] | Priority number, date | DE201710103751 | 23.02.2017 Original published format: DE102017103751 | [2018/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3367027 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/02, A47F3/04 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
F25D23/02 (EP);
F25D23/028 (US);
A47F3/043 (EP,US);
E05F1/046 (US);
E05F15/70 (US);
F25D23/021 (US);
F25D23/06 (EP);
A47F3/005 (US);
A47F3/0434 (US);
E05Y2201/628 (US);
E05Y2201/652 (US);
E05Y2201/71 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Scheibenverbund, insbesondere als bestandteil eines Kühlmöbels | [2018/35] | English: | Glass assembly, in particular as a component of a refrigeration appliance | [2018/35] | French: | Vitrage composite, en particulier en tant que partie constitutive d'un meuble frigorifique | [2018/35] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 14.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE6931454U (MEYER WILLI [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10,15 * figures 1-3 * * page 5 - page 6 * [I] 8; | [A]DE3520973 (MOZ PETER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3813940 (LEIPZIG INGENIEURBAU [DD]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2002000115 (SEIKO GLASS KK) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]DE202004001795U (SCHMID HOLZBAU GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7-11,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0022] *; | [XI]GB2435896 (SIMPSON ALEXANDER [GB]) [X] 1-7,9,10,15 * abstract * * page 4, line 17 - page 6, line 21 * [I] 8; | [A]WO2014175190 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]DE202014010754U (WEISS ALBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,9,10,13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] - [0081] * [I] 8 |