EP3373083 - POWER GENERATION SYSTEM CONTROL THROUGH ADAPTIVE LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 8 5400 Baden / CH | [2023/50] |
Former [2018/37] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EWENS, David Spencer 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 02 /
SEELY, William Forrester 300 Garlington Road 256 DGTTC Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Fischer, Michael Maria General Electric Technology GmbH Global Patent Operation - Europe Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 18156724.9 | 14.02.2018 | [2018/37] | Priority number, date | US201715454807 | 09.03.2017 Original published format: US201715454807 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3373083 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/02, G05B13/04 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
G05B13/0265 (EP,US);
G05B13/041 (US);
G05B13/04 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] |
Former [2018/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMERZEUGUNGSSYSTEMSTEUERUNG DURCH ADAPTIVES LERNEN | [2018/37] | English: | POWER GENERATION SYSTEM CONTROL THROUGH ADAPTIVE LEARNING | [2018/37] | French: | COMMANDE DE SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION DE PUISSANCE PAR APPRENTISSAGE ADAPTATIF | [2018/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 12.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007073525 (HEALY TIMOTHY A [US], et al) [X] 1,10-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0041] * [I] 4-9; | [A]US2013054031 (WILKES KEVIN WOOD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013066615 (MORGAN REX ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI] - Shahrokh Akhlaghi ET AL, "Adaptive adjustment of noise covariance in Kalman filter for dynamic state estimation", arXiv, (20170203), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://arxiv.org/ftp/arxiv/papers/1702/1702.00884.pdf, (20180712), XP055492183 [X] 1-4,10,13,15 * page 1 - page 5 * [I] 5-9,11,12,14 | [A] - MEHRA R K, "On the identification of variances and adaptive Kalman filtering", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AUTOMATIC CONTROL, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (19700401), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TAC.1970.1099422, ISSN 0018-9286, pages 175 - 184, XP003020390 [A] 2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAC.1970.1099422 |