EP3369473 - FACILITY AND METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF A FEED GAS STREAM COMPRISING METHANE AND CARBON DIOXIDE BY MEMBRANE PERMEATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRINCE, Guenael 8, rue de la Sapinière 38120 SAINT EGREVE / FR | 02 /
PAGET, Nicolas 29 avenue de la Galochère 38400 Saint Martin d'Hères / FR | 03 /
ZICK, Golo 47, rue Jean Pain 38600 FONTAINE / FR | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | Laigneau, Amandine L'Air Liquide Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18156815.5 | 14.02.2018 | [2018/36] | Priority number, date | FR20170051688 | 02.03.2017 Original published format: FR 1751688 | [2018/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3369473 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22, C10L3/10 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
C10L3/104 (EP,CN,US);
C07C7/005 (CN);
B01D53/226 (US);
B01D53/225 (EP,US);
B01D53/228 (CN);
C07C7/144 (CN);
B01D2256/245 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2258/05 (EP,US);
C10L2290/46 (US);
C10L2290/548 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C7/005, C07C9/04 (CN);
C07C7/144, C07C9/04 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] |
Former [2018/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG DURCH MEMBRANPERMEATION EINES ZUFÜHR-GASSTROMS, DER METHAN UND KOHLENDIOXID ENTHÄLT | [2018/36] | English: | FACILITY AND METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF A FEED GAS STREAM COMPRISING METHANE AND CARBON DIOXIDE BY MEMBRANE PERMEATION | [2018/36] | French: | INSTALLATION ET PROCEDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT PAR PERMEATION MEMBRANAIRE D'UN FLUX GAZEUX D'ALIMENTATION COMPRENANT DU METHANE ET DU DIOXYDE DE CARBONE | [2018/36] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 05.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4386944 (KIMURA SHIRO G) [Y] 1,3-10,12-15 * column 1, line 12 - column 1, line 28; figure 1 *; | [Y]JPS63248418 (UBE INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP2196252 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1,3-10,12-15 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP2735355 (TECH UNIVERSITÄT WIEN [AT], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0027] , [0047]; figures 5,6 *; | [Y]AT515137 (GRUBER-SCHMIDT JOHANN [AT]) [Y] 4-6,13-15 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 1 * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 9 ** figures 4-6 * |