EP3354790 - DOMESTIC APPLIANCE WITH A WATER RESERVOIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTAROSSA, Alberto Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 24 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 02 /
QUARONI, Riccardo Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 24 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 03 /
ARREGHINI, Luigi Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 24 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 04 /
SCHMIDT, Dieter Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 24 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 18157402.1 | 01.06.2006 | [2018/31] | Previously filed application, date | EP20140165571 | 01.06.2006 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3354790 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3354790 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/20, D06F35/00, D06F39/00 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
D06F39/40 (EP,US);
D06F58/203 (EP,US);
D06F2103/62 (EP,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US);
D06F34/20 (EP,US);
D06F34/32 (EP,US);
D06F39/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/11] |
Former [2018/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSGERÄT MIT WASSERRESERVOIR | [2018/31] | English: | DOMESTIC APPLIANCE WITH A WATER RESERVOIR | [2018/31] | French: | APPAREIL DOMESTIQUE AVEC RÉSERVOIR D'EAU | [2018/31] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 01.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06011419.6 / EP1862584 | EP10179143.2 / EP2314756 | EP14165571.2 / EP2781645 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2006 | AT | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | DK | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | ES | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | NL | 15.04.2020 | PL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | TR | 15.04.2020 | IE | 01.06.2020 | LU | 01.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | IS | 15.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/24] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 01.06.2020 | ||
LU | 01.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 01.06.2020 | ||
LU | 01.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
LU | 01.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 15.04.2020 | |
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10260151 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure -; claim 7 *; | [A]EP1441060 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 1-14 * figure 2 *; | [Y]DE10332656 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [Y] 1-4,7,13 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 25]; figure -; claims 1-5 *; | [YA]EP1469120 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0047]; figure - * [A] 2-14; | [YA]US2006016020 (PARK SEOK K [KR]) [Y] 1-4,7,13 * figure 5 *[A] 5,6,8-12,14 |