EP3343279 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-City Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Jonghyuk 822-2002, 232, Yeongtong-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si (Woosung Apt., Yeongtong-dong) 16698 Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Daehyun 146-1603, 231, Dongtanbanseok-ro, Hwaseong-si (Dongtan Yedang Maeul Lotte Castle Apt. Seoku-dong) 18447 Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 03 /
IM, Hyundeok 1st Floor, 4, Baramdeuri 6-gil, Songpa-gu (Pungnap-dong) 05517 Seoul / KR | 04 /
KANG, Jaewoong 104-1203, 11, Anhaeng 5-gil, Wansan-gu, Jeonju-si (Kumho Cheongsol Apt., Samcheon-dong 1-ga) 55105 Jeollabuk-do / KR | 05 /
PARK, Jaebyung 119-2203, 275, Banpo-daero, Seocho-gu (Raemian Firstige Apt., Banpo-dong) 06547 Seoul / KR | 06 /
CHO, Hyunmin 711, 11-6, Saimdang-ro 19-gil, Seocho-gu (Lotte Village, Seocho-dong) 06637 Seoul / KR | 07 /
HONG, Sungjin P.O. Box 18445 C-5001, 200, Dongtanjungang-ro, Hwaseong-si (Metapolis Apt., Bansong-dong) Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 18157715.6 | 12.01.2016 | [2018/27] | Priority number, date | KR20150006461 | 13.01.2015 Original published format: KR 20150006461 | KR20150153725 | 03.11.2015 Original published format: KR 20150153725 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3343279 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3343279 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
G02F1/133617 (EP,US);
G02F1/13362 (EP,CN,US);
F21V9/30 (US);
G02B6/005 (US);
G02B6/0073 (US);
G02F1/1336 (US);
G02F1/133621 (CN);
H01L33/504 (US);
H01L33/56 (US);
G02F1/133602 (EP,US);
G02F1/133614 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/133615 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] |
Former [2018/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/27] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2018/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2018/27] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 25.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/32] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16150954.2 / EP3045963 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012250351 (SHIN MYEONG-JU [KR], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4,7-9 * * and the associated text passages * * claims 1-4 * [I] 4-6; | [A]US2014153217 (KANG MUN SUK [KR]) [A] 1,2,4-6* the whole document * |