EP3363501 - SYSTEM FOR SECURING A PERSON AT HEIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dehondt, Thierry Jean Alain Cornil 17 allée Blaise Pascal 51430 Tinqueux / FR | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Sayettat, Julien Christian Strato-IP 63, Boulevard de Ménilmontant 75011 Paris / FR | [2018/34] | Application number, filing date | 18157731.3 | 20.02.2018 | [2018/34] | Priority number, date | FR20170070161 | 20.02.2017 Original published format: FR 1770161 | [2018/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3363501 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/00, F16B45/02 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
F16B45/02 (EP);
F16B45/024 (US);
A62B35/0075 (EP);
F16B45/023 (US);
F16B45/027 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTZURRSYSTEM EINER PERSON IN DER HÖHE | [2018/34] | English: | SYSTEM FOR SECURING A PERSON AT HEIGHT | [2018/34] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ARRIMAGE D'UNE PERSONNE EN HAUTEUR | [2018/34] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/34] | 18.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4423796 (SULOWSKI ANDREW C [CA], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2694044 (FAMECA SA [FR]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]WO2008049899 (FASZINATOUR TOURISTIK TRAINING [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008049143 (STRASSER PHILIPP [AT]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2009092576 (AERIALTECH S A [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9 * pages 11-18; figures 1-8 * [I] 4,5,7,8; | [XI]FR2972361 (SOREAM [FR]) [X] 1,3,6 * pages 4-10; figures 1-7 * [I] 2,4,5,7-9; | [A]DE102015113329 (EDELRID GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |