EP3372679 - COMPOSITION FOR CLEAVING A TARGET DNA COMPRISING A GUIDE RNA SPECIFIC FOR THE TARGET DNA AND CAS PROTEIN-ENCODING NUCLEIC ACID OR CAS PROTEIN, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2019 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toolgen Incorporated 1204, Byucksan Digital Valley 6-cha 219 Gasan Digital 1-ro Seoul 08501 / KR | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jin-Soo National Creative Research Initiatives Center for Genome Engineering and Department of Chemistry Seoul National University Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-747 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Seung Woo National Creative Research Initiatives Center for Genome Engineering and Department of Chemistry Seoul National University Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-747 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Sojung National Creative Research Initiatives Center for Genome Engineering and Department of Chemistry Seoul National University Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-747 / KR | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18158147.1 | 23.10.2013 | [2018/37] | Priority number, date | US201261717324P | 23.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261717324 P | US201361803599P | 20.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361803599 P | US201361837481P | 20.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361837481 P | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3372679 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/22, C12N15/82, C12N15/63, C12N15/10, C12N15/11 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12Q1/683 (KR);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (KR);
C12N15/63 (EP,US);
C12N15/8216 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/85 (US);
C12N15/8509 (KR);
C12N15/907 (US);
C12N9/16 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12Y301/21 (EP,US);
C12N2310/10 (US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,US);
C12N2310/531 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] |
Former [2018/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 10.12.2018 | ME | 10.12.2018 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR SPALTUNG EINER ZIEL-DNA MIT EINER FÜR DIE ZIEL-DNA SPEZIFISCHEN LEIT-RNA UND FÜR CAS-PROTEIN CODIERENDE NUKLEINSÄURE ODER CAS-PROTEIN SOWIE VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2020/43] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR CLEAVING A TARGET DNA COMPRISING A GUIDE RNA SPECIFIC FOR THE TARGET DNA AND CAS PROTEIN-ENCODING NUCLEIC ACID OR CAS PROTEIN, AND USE THEREOF | [2018/37] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LE CLIVAGE D'UN ADN CIBLE COMPRENANT UN ARN GUIDE SPÉCIFIQUE DE L'ADN CIBLE ET UN ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE CODANT POUR LA PROTÉINE CAS OU LA PROTÉINE CAS, ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2018/37] |
Former [2018/37] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR SPALTUNG EINER ZIEL-DNA MIT EINER FÜR DIE ZIEL-DNA SPEZIFISCHEN LEIT-DNA UND FÜR CAS-PROTEIN CODIERENDE NUKLEINSÄURE ODER CAS-PROTEIN SOWIE VERWENDUNG DAVON | Examination procedure | 10.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 10.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2019 | Observations by third parties | 21.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2021 | Observations by third parties | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13849670.8 / EP2912175 | Divisional application(s) | EP20164644.5 / EP3733847 | EP22176546.4 / EP4180526 | EP23183112.4 / EP4342987 | EP24158339.2 | EP24165188.4 | EP24165204.9 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010076939 (TOOLGEN INC [KR], et al); | [E]WO2013176772 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [E]WO2014197568 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]); | [E]WO2014204725 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al); | other | EP2912175 | EP3138910 |