EP3530265 - UNIVERSAL METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF LIPID-BASED COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LipoCoat B.V. Drienerlolaan 5 7522 NB Enschede / NL | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weerd van, Jasper LipoCoat B.V. Drienerlolaan 5 7522 NB Enschede / NL | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Renkema, Jaap IPecunia Patents B.V. P.O. Box 593 6160 AN Geleen / NL | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 18158839.3 | 27.02.2018 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3530265 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, B29D11/00, C23C18/00 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
A61L27/54 (EP);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L29/08 (US);
A61L31/08 (US);
A61L31/16 (US);
G02B1/10 (US);
A61K9/1271 (EP);
A61K9/1277 (EP);
A61L2300/22 (EP,US);
A61L2300/606 (EP,US);
A61L2300/62 (EP,US);
B29D11/00038 (EP);
B29D11/00865 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LIPIDBASIERTEN BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2019/35] | English: | UNIVERSAL METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF LIPID-BASED COATINGS | [2019/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ UNIVERSEL DE PRÉPARATION DE REVÊTEMENTS À BASE DE LIPIDES | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 20.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0158910 (LIPLASOME PHARMA AS [DK], et al); | [X]EP3093661 (UNIV SEOUL NAT R & DB FOUND [KR]); | by applicant | US2008241942 | WO2014184383 |