EP3364484 - BATTERY MODULE AND BATTERY PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harada, Yasuhiro c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Takami, Norio c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Yorikazu c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Ise, Kazuki c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/34] | Application number, filing date | 18159133.0 | 29.01.2016 | [2018/34] | Priority number, date | JP20150017227 | 30.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015017227 | JP20150050791 | 13.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015050791 | [2018/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3364484 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/485, B60L11/18, C01G23/00, // H01M2/10, H01M10/04, H01M10/0525, H01M10/42, H01M10/48 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
B60L50/64 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/485 (EP,KR,US);
B60L58/21 (EP,KR,US);
C01G23/003 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/4207 (KR);
H01M10/425 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/44 (US);
H01M4/131 (KR,US);
H01M50/20 (KR);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,US);
H01M50/502 (KR);
H01M50/543 (KR);
H01M50/581 (US);
C01P2002/74 (EP,US);
C01P2002/76 (EP,US);
C01P2004/84 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
H01M10/0481 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
H01M2004/021 (KR);
H01M2220/20 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/30 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0017 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL UND BATTERIEPACK | [2018/34] | English: | BATTERY MODULE AND BATTERY PACK | [2018/34] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE ET BLOC BATTERIE | [2018/34] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 28.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/34] | 05.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16743550.2 / EP3147974 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005267940 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * tables 1-3 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0028] *; | [E]EP3229296 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [E] 1-12 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0092] * * figures 1-8; tables 1, 2 *; | [A] - LAO MENGMENG ET AL, "Preparation and electrochemical characterization of Li2+xNa2-xTi6O14(0<=x<=0.2) as anode materials for lithium-i", CERAMICS INTERNATIONAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20141027), vol. 41, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CERAMINT.2014.10.115, ISSN 0272-8842, pages 2900 - 2907, XP029106099 [A] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ceramint.2014.10.115 | [A] - DETCHEVA A ET AL, "Analysis of single crystals based on strontium-lithium-titanium oxides by inductively coupled plasma atomic emission spectrometry", SPECTROCHIMICA ACTA. PART B: ATOMIC SPECTROSC, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (20030815), vol. 58, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S0584-8547(03)00096-X, ISSN 0584-8547, pages 1481 - 1488, XP004703791 [A] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0584-8547(03)00096-X | by applicant | JP4237659B | JP2013008493 | JP2014103032 | - Electrochemistry Communications, (20030000), vol. 5, pages 435 - 438 | - Electrochemistry Communications, (20090000), vol. 11, pages 1251 - 1254 | - "Funmatsu X sen Kaisetsu no Jissai (Reality of Powder X-Ray Analysis", IZUMI NAKAI; FUJIO IZUMI, X-Ray Analysis Investigation Conversazione, The Japan Society for Analytical Chemistry, Asakura Publishing Co., Ltd. |