EP3536362 - DEVICE FOR HOLDING PLUG OVER AN OPENING OF A VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHL Medical AG Gubelstrasse 22 PO Box 7710 6302 Zug / CH | [2021/16] |
Former [2019/37] | For all designated states Weibel CDS AG Urnäscherstrasse 51 9104 Waldstatt / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasler, Peter Sunnenbergstrasse 37 8447 Dachsen / CH | 02 /
Egloff, Christoph Rütistrasse 4 8224 Löhningen / CH | 03 /
Weibel, Ludwig Daniel - verstorben / CH | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | SHL Medical Gubelstrasse 22 PO Box 7710 6302 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 18159963.0 | 05.03.2018 | [2019/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3536362 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, B65B1/04, B65B3/00, B65B7/28 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
A61M5/008 (EP);
B65B7/2807 (EP);
B65B7/2821 (EP);
A61M5/284 (EP);
B65B3/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] |
Former [2019/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM HALTEN VON STOPFEN ÜBER EINER ÖFFNUNG EINES GEFÄSSES | [2019/37] | English: | DEVICE FOR HOLDING PLUG OVER AN OPENING OF A VESSEL | [2019/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN BOUCHON SUR UNE OUVERTURE D'UN RÉCIPIENT | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 10.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH07328117 (ARUTE KK) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-11; | [XI]US6290680 (FORSBERG MIKAEL [SE], et al) [X] 1-14,16 * the whole document * [I] 15; | [AD]WO2016087627 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [AD] 1-16* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2016166769 (SCHOTT KAISHA PVT LTD [IN]) [Y] 2-11 * page 1, line 15 - line 24; figures 1-4, 11 * | by applicant | WO2012168268 | WO2016087627 |