EP3536851 - LYOCELL FIBER WITH INCREASED TENDENCY TO FIBRILLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LENZING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werkstrasse 2 4860 Lenzing / AT | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Opietnik, Martina Seegarten 8 4861 Schörfling am Attersee / AT | 02 /
Silbermann, Verena Weiterschwang 91 4851 Gampern / AT | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 18160137.8 | 06.03.2018 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3536851 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D21C9/00, D21H11/00, D21H13/00, D21H13/02, D21H13/08, D01F2/02 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
D21H11/00 (EP);
D01F2/06 (US);
D01F2/00 (EP);
D04H1/4258 (EP,US);
D04H3/013 (EP,US);
D21C9/001 (EP);
D21H13/00 (EP);
D21H13/02 (EP);
D21H13/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LYOCELLFASER MIT ERHÖHTER NEIGUNG ZUR FIBRILLIERUNG | [2019/37] | English: | LYOCELL FIBER WITH INCREASED TENDENCY TO FIBRILLATE | [2019/37] | French: | FIBRE LYOCELL PRÉSENTANT UNE TENDANCE ACCRUE À LA FIBRILLATION | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/35] | 01.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9947733 (WEYERHAEUSER CO [US], et al); | [A]WO0181664 (WEYERHAEUSER CO [US], et al); | [A]WO2011079331 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT], et al); | [A]WO2014161018 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]); | [XI]US2015184338 (LUO MENGKUI [US], et al); | [A]WO2016197156 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]) | by applicant | US4246221 | WO9319230 | WO9428214 | WO9428217 | WO9502082 | WO9633221 | WO9633934 | WO9738153 | WO9805702 | US6042769 | US6706237 | US8187422 | US8420004 | AT515693B | US9222222 | WO2016065377 |