EP3378662 - LIQUID DISCHARGING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.2020 [2020/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Sukehiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
HAYAKAWA, Naoto c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
HIRAMATSU, Kazunori c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 18160686.4 | 08.03.2018 | [2018/39] | Priority number, date | JP20170056642 | 22.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017056642 | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3378662 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045, B41J2/14, B41J2/15, B41J11/00, B41J19/00 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
B41J2/04588 (EP);
B41J2/01 (CN);
B41J2/04541 (EP,US);
B41J11/001 (US);
B41J19/005 (EP,US);
B41J2/045 (CN);
B41J2/04508 (US);
B41J2/04581 (EP,US);
B41J2/04593 (EP);
B41J2/14201 (US);
B41J2/1433 (US);
B41J2/15 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/39] | B41J19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] |
Former [2018/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/39] | English: | LIQUID DISCHARGING APPARATUS | [2018/39] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉCHARGE DE LIQUIDE | [2018/39] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 23.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/05] | 06.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07242039 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013278680 (OTA HIDENOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0096]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2014285551 (OTSUKA SHUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0161]; figures 1-19 *; | [A]US2014292871 (KONDO HIROFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0107]; figures 1-13 * | by applicant | JP4196523B | JP2014133358 |