EP3372458 - LOCKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUF Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Str. 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trischberger, Werner Altomünsterstr. 20a 85229 Langenpettenbach/Markt Indersdorf / DE | 02 /
Pieronczyk, Martin Udldinger Straße 7 85221 Dachau / DE | 03 /
Denzle, Michael Ganghoferstrasse 21 86356 Neusäß / DE | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 18160707.8 | 08.03.2018 | [2018/37] | Priority number, date | DE201710104795 | 08.03.2017 Original published format: DE102017104795 | [2018/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3372458 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3372458 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/021 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
B60R25/0211 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] |
Former [2018/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPERRVORRICHTUNG | [2018/37] | English: | LOCKING DEVICE | [2018/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE | [2018/37] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 12.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2018 | AL | 12.05.2021 | CY | 12.05.2021 | CZ | 12.05.2021 | DK | 12.05.2021 | EE | 12.05.2021 | ES | 12.05.2021 | FI | 12.05.2021 | HR | 12.05.2021 | IT | 12.05.2021 | LT | 12.05.2021 | LV | 12.05.2021 | MC | 12.05.2021 | MK | 12.05.2021 | MT | 12.05.2021 | NL | 12.05.2021 | PL | 12.05.2021 | RO | 12.05.2021 | RS | 12.05.2021 | SE | 12.05.2021 | SI | 12.05.2021 | SK | 12.05.2021 | SM | 12.05.2021 | TR | 12.05.2021 | BG | 12.08.2021 | NO | 12.08.2021 | GR | 13.08.2021 | IS | 12.09.2021 | PT | 13.09.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 08.03.2018 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
MK | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
TR | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 08.03.2018 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
MK | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 08.03.2018 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.03.2018 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 12.05.2021 | |
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 12.05.2021 | |
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 12.05.2021 | |
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 12.05.2021 | |
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1182104 (VALEO DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0020] - [0024] *; | [A]EP1982878 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [X]EP2025567 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0035] *; | [XI]EP2842818 (ALPHA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,8,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0014] - [0021] - [0024] - [0026] - [0029] - [0031] , [0034] * [I] 2-7,9-13,15; | [E]EP3296164 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [E] 1,8* abstract * |