EP3540233 - CENTRIFUGAL PUMP ASSEMBLY WITH ROTATABLE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grundfos Holding A/S Poul Due Jensens Vej 7-11 8850 Bjerringbro / DK | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLAD, Thomas Hedemøllevej 23 8850 Bjerringbro / DK | 02 /
BLAD, Christian Ryesgade 51 2. th 9000 Aalborg / DK | 03 /
MØNSTER, Peter Mølleparken 4 8900 Randers C / DK | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hemmer Lindfeld Frese Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 18161524.6 | 13.03.2018 | [2019/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3540233 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F04D15/00, F04D29/02, F04D29/48 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
F04D15/0016 (EP,US);
F04D13/0606 (US);
F04D15/0066 (EP);
F04D29/026 (EP);
F04D29/486 (EP,US);
F05D2250/52 (EP);
F05D2300/501 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREISELPUMPENAGGREGAT MIT DREHBAREM VENTILELEMENT | [2019/38] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL PUMP ASSEMBLY WITH ROTATABLE VALVE | [2019/38] | French: | GROUPE POMPE CENTRIFUGE AVEC VALVE ROTATIVE | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4869076 (SAKAI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,14,16 * column 6, line 25 - line 57 * * figures 6-9 * [I] 15,17; | [A]JPH1043121 (ZOJIRUSHI CORP) [A] 1-17 * abstract ** figures 1, 2, 4, 5 *; | [XI]US2004071547 (ELEXPURU ANTON [ES]) [X] 1-7,14,16 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0022] * * figures 2-4 * [I] 15,17; | [XI]US2004173249 (ASSMANN WALTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-14,16 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1, 3-6, 8, 10 * [I] 15,17; | [A]US2017356449 (BLAD THOMAS [DK], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0143] * * figure 20 * |