EP3375487 - NATURAL-BASED MASCARA WITH HIGH COSMETIC EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prodotti Gianni S.r.l. Via M.F. Quintiliano 30 20138 Milano / IT | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANSELMI, Cecilia Piazza del Sale, 6/9 I-53100 Siena / IT | 02 /
CENTINI, Marisanna Via Lorenzetti, 16 I-53027 San Quirico d'Orcia (SI) / IT | 03 /
SILVERIO, Cristina Via Nazionale, 237 I-84034 Padula (SA) / IT | 04 /
TOLA, Maria Francesca Via Antonio Canaletto, 30 I-90047 Partinico (PA) / IT | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Gerli, Paolo Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/38] | Gerli, Paolo Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 18161895.0 | 15.03.2018 | [2018/38] | Priority number, date | IT20170028649 | 15.03.2017 Original published format: IT201700028649 | [2018/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3375487 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3375487 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q1/10, A61K8/9789, A61K8/9794 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
A61Q1/10 (EP);
A61K8/9789 (EP);
A61K8/9794 (EP);
A61K2800/30 (EP);
A61K2800/592 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] |
Former [2018/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NATURBASIERTE MASCARA MIT STARKEM KOSMETISCHEM EFFEKT | [2018/38] | English: | NATURAL-BASED MASCARA WITH HIGH COSMETIC EFFECT | [2018/38] | French: | MASCARA NATUREL À EFFET COSMÉTIQUE ÉLEVÉ | [2018/38] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 06.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2018 | AL | 08.01.2020 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | ES | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | IE | 15.03.2020 | LU | 15.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 15.03.2018 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 15.03.2020 | ||
LU | 15.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.03.2018 | |
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 15.03.2020 | ||
LU | 15.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 15.03.2020 | ||
LU | 15.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 15.03.2020 | ||
LU | 15.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
LU | 15.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]KR20000026081 (PACIFIC CO LTD) [YD] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US2004219124 (GUPTA SHYAM K [US]) [A] 1-12 * example 3 *; | [YD]WO2011158161 (OREAL [FR], et al) [YD] 1-12 * page 17, line 8 - page 18, line 17 *; | [Y]WO2012012084 (AVEDA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 1, lines 13-17 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 25 * * page 7, lines 8-12 * * page 12, line 30; example - *; | [A]US8846018 (ATIS BALANDA [US], et al) [A] 1-12* column 8, lines 28-36 *; | [Y]US2015297473 (FAVA BEKISZ COLLETTE [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0045] * | by applicant | KR20000026081 | JP2002308735 | US2004219124 | WO2011158161 | WO2012012084 | WO2013007599 | FR2984124 | US2013164241 | CN103893097 | WO2014105733 | US2015297473 |