EP3376364 - CHARGE CALCULATION APPARATUS, METHOD, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMIJIMA, Kyoichi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Hiroyuki c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
NISHIWAKI, Kazuya c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 18162167.3 | 16.03.2018 | [2018/38] | Priority number, date | JP20170050919 | 16.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017050919 | [2018/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3376364 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, G03G21/02 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
G06Q40/12 (EP,US);
G07F17/26 (CN);
G03G21/02 (EP,US);
G06F3/1204 (EP,US);
G06F3/1239 (EP,US);
G06F3/1259 (EP,US);
G06F3/1285 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
H04N1/346 (EP,US);
G06F2206/1504 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] |
Former [2018/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LADUNGSBERECHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM | [2018/38] | English: | CHARGE CALCULATION APPARATUS, METHOD, AND SYSTEM | [2018/38] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ, ET SYSTÈME DE CALCUL DE CHARGE | [2018/38] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 19.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013141761 (YOSHIDA HIDETAKA [JP]) [X] 1,7,15 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0127] ** figures 1, 4, 5 *; | [XI]EP2693328 (KYOCERA DOCUMENT SOLUTIONS INC [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-11,14,15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0089] * * figures 1, 2, 7-12 * [I] 5,12,13 | by applicant | JP2009286007 |