EP3379334 - TONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUO, Ryuichiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
MIURA, Masaharu c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
IWASAKI, Yosuke c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 04 /
KATSUMATA, Wakiko c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 05 /
MITSUIKI, Kenta c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 06 /
KAMAE, Kentaro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 07 /
OHTSU, Takeshi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 08 /
ISHIGAMI, Koh c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 09 /
MIZO, Yuichi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 18162198.8 | 16.03.2018 | [2018/39] | Priority number, date | JP20170054301 | 21.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017054301 | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3379334 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/08, G03G9/097 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
G03G9/0815 (EP,US);
G03G9/0821 (CN);
G03G9/0802 (CN,US);
G03G9/0825 (US);
G03G9/08755 (US);
G03G9/09708 (EP,US);
G03G9/09725 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] |
Former [2018/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TONER | [2018/39] | English: | TONER | [2018/39] | French: | TONER | [2018/39] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 26.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6214511 (AKAZAWA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* claims 1-47 *; | [A]EP1455237 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0257] - paragraph [0259] * * paragraph [0222] - paragraph [0229] * * claims 1-17 *; | [X]EP2696244 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0195] - paragraph [0198] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0202] - paragraph [0205] * * paragraph [0201] *; | [A]EP3106922 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0184] - paragraph [0187] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0106] * | by applicant | JP2007279239 | JP2011186402 |