EP3388894 - AIRCRAFT DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSEN, Ty A 5732 East Drive Everett, WA 98203 / US | 02 /
COTE, Richard A 1532 145th Place Southeast Mill Creek, WA 98012 / US | 03 /
HARVEY, Eric 2315 Warren Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109 / US | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 18162255.6 | 12.06.2012 | [2018/42] | Priority number, date | US201113169984 | 27.06.2011 Original published format: US201113169984 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3388894 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3388894 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/00, B64D47/02, G03B21/14, G03B29/00, G09F19/18, G09F21/06, G09F21/08, G09F21/10, G09G3/02 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
G03B21/145 (EP,US);
B64D47/02 (EP,US);
G03B29/00 (EP,US);
G09F19/18 (EP,US);
G09F21/06 (EP,US);
G09F21/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | FLUGZEUGANZEIGESYSTEM | [2018/42] | English: | AIRCRAFT DISPLAY SYSTEM | [2018/42] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE D'AÉRONEF | [2018/42] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12171646.8 / EP2549329 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4299442 (BUCKELEW ARTHUR L) [A] 1-11,13-15* projection system for visual identification and location of an aircraft; column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 57; figures 1-5 *; | [XI]US4633376 (NEWMAN FRANK J [US]) [X] 1,13 * apparatus for projecting an image on an external surface of an aircraft; column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 19; figures 1-2 * [I] 2-11,14,15; | [A]US5825305 (BIFERNO MICHAEL A [US]) [A] 1-11,13-15 * system for projecting a beam of light on the loading surface of an aircraft; column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 17; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2002018009 (RAST RODGER H [US]) [A] 1-11,13-15 * projection system and method for avoiding aircraft striking of obstructions; paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-13 *; | [XI]JP2009251027 (JAPAN AEROSPACE EXPLORATION) [X] 1,13 * abstract * [I] 2-11,14,15; | [X]WO2010025490 (SIDLER JOANE ANDRE [AU]) [X] 1-11,13-15 * page 10, line 3 - page 14, line 21; figures 5-7 *; | [A]US2010302072 (LARCHER DAVID [FR]) [A] 1-11,13-15 * apparatus for projecting an image on a part of a surface on the ground of an hazard area; paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-4 * |