EP3539420 - LABORATORY CABINET FOR STORING LABORATORY SAMPLES WITH MAGNETIC CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eppendorf AG Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schafrinski, Arne Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Kirchner, Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5 - 7 80331 München / DE | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 18162381.0 | 16.03.2018 | [2019/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3539420 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47B81/00, B01L1/02, C12M1/00, E05C19/16 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
E05C19/16 (EP);
B01L1/025 (EP,US);
C12M41/14 (EP,US);
E05B1/003 (US);
E05B15/0053 (EP);
B01L2200/0689 (EP);
B01L2300/10 (EP);
E05Y2201/22 (US);
E05Y2201/462 (US);
E05Y2900/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LABORSCHRANKVORRICHTUNG ZUM LAGERN VON LABORPROBEN MIT MAGNETVERSCHLUSS | [2019/38] | English: | LABORATORY CABINET FOR STORING LABORATORY SAMPLES WITH MAGNETIC CLOSURE | [2019/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF FORMANT ARMOIRE DE LABORATOIRE DESTINÉ AU STOCKAGE DES ÉCHANTILLONS DE LABORATOIRE À FERMETURE MAGNÉTIQUE | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD97706 (SCHNEIDEREIT, MARTIN) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]EP0238313 (FLOW LAB [GB]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 31 - line 36; figure 4 *; | [A]DE8902181U (TECHNOPLAN PROJEKTPLANUNG PRODUKTENTWICKLUNG VERTRIEB GMBH) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012043768 (GRAHAM THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |